Tabak v. Source Digital, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Margaret M Garnett |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02857 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 11:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Source Digital, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Alec Tabak
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Thu 04/18 10:40 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/13/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Margaret M. Garnett. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 4/18/2024) (jca) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Wed 04/17 9:40 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 9:40 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Source Digital, Inc...(jgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/17 9:23 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/17 9:31 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/17 9:31 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/16 11:21 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Renee Jennifer Aragona on behalf of Alec Tabak..(Aragona, Renee) |
|
4 | 4
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Tue 04/16 10:31 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sanders, Craig) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/16 10:30 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Source Digital, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Alec Tabak..(Sanders, Craig) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/16 10:29 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sanders, Craig) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 10:29 AM
COMPLAINT against Source Digital, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29223901)Document filed by Alec Tabak..(Sanders, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Photographs, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Infringing Uses of Photographs |