Iowa Northern District Court
Judge:Cj Williams
Referred: Mark A Roberts
Case #: 6:24-cv-02016
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 13, 2024 4:06 AM CDT
Defendant
Terry Cosby
Represented By
Brian Joseph Keogh
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Brandon J Gray
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Jon Hubbert
Represented By
Brian Joseph Keogh
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Brandon J Gray
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Natural Resources Conservation Service
Represented By
Brian Joseph Keogh
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Brandon J Gray
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By
Brian Joseph Keogh
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Brandon J Gray
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Thomas J Vilsack
Represented By
Brian Joseph Keogh
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Brandon J Gray
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Dakota Rural Action
Represented By
Joshua T Mandelbaum
Environmental Law & Policy Center
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Food & Water Watch
Represented By
Joshua T Mandelbaum
Environmental Law & Policy Center
contact info
Danielle Replogle
Food & Water Watch
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Iowa Environmental Council
Represented By
Joshua T Mandelbaum
Environmental Law & Policy Center
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Iowa Farmers Union
Represented By
Joshua T Mandelbaum
Environmental Law & Policy Center
contact info
Kathleen Erin Garvey
contact info
Plaintiff
CTM Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Reilly Stephens
Liberty Justice Center
contact info
Paige Elizabeth Gilliard
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
James V. F. Dickey
Upper Midwest Law Center
contact info
Jeffrey Wilson McCoy
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Loren A Seehase
Liberty Justice Center
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
75 75 motion Continue Trial Tue 05/13 12:03 PM
JOINT MOTION to Continue Trial by Plaintiff CTM Holdings, LLC. (Seehase, Loren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
74 74 misc Transcript Thu 05/08 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript of Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment held on 3/31/2025 before Chief Judge CJ Williams. Court Reporter: Patrice Murray, Email Address: PAMurrayReporting@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter, the Clerk of Court's office, or PACER. Please see Public Administrative Order No. 08-AO-0009-P in regard to relevant policy and access information on the court's website at www.iand.uscourts.gov Redaction Request due 5/29/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2025. (pac)
Related: [-]