Brandon v. Sensio, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie Abrams |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02859 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 12:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Sensio, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Delana Brandon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/29 2:51 PM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint , or to move, otherwise respond to Complaint, and request to set a briefing schedule addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Colleen Carey Gulliver dated April 26,. Application granted. SO ORDERED. Sensio, Inc. answer due 6/24/2024. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/29/2024) (ate) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 04/29 2:52 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 6/24/2024. Responses due by 7/26/2024. Replies due by 8/16/2024. (ate) |
||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 04/26 2:13 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint , or to move, otherwise respond to Complaint, and request to set a briefing schedule addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Colleen Carey Gulliver dated April 26, 2024. Document filed by Sensio, Inc...(Gulliver, Colleen) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/26 2:00 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Colleen Gulliver on behalf of Sensio, Inc...(Gulliver, Colleen) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 12:40 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Paul Doolittle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 12:15 PM
MOTION for Paul Doolittle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29259120. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Delana Brandon..(Doolittle, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit In support of the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate Of Good Standing SC | ||
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Tue 04/23 12:22 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 6 MOTION for Paul Doolittle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29259120. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Fri 04/19 1:32 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/21/2024 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. Unless the parties request otherwise, the Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/19/2024) (vfr) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 10:20 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sensio, Inc...(jgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/17 10:15 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/17 10:18 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/17 10:19 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/16 11:22 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SENSIO, INC., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Delana Brandon..(Furia, Philip) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/16 11:20 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Furia, Philip) |
|
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 11:19 AM
COMPLAINT against Sensio, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29224446)Document filed by Delana Brandon..(Furia, Philip) |