Ghatanfard et al v. Zivkovic
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Seibel |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-02858 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | USBC-SDNY, 23-B-22840 (SHL) |
Debtor
Davoud Ghatanfard
, |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 12:09 PM EDT |
Appellant
Davoud Ghatanfard
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
Pavle Zivkovic
|
Represented By
|
In Re
Davoud Ghatanfard
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/19 10:59 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lucas Colin Buzzard on behalf of Pavle Zivkovic..(Buzzard, Lucas) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
23
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Thu 04/18 6:13 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:3 MOTION to Stay pending appeal . . Document filed by Davoud Ghatanfard..(Penachio, Anne) Modified on 4/18/2024 (db) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
Thu 04/18 10:42 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Anne Julia Penachio to RE-FILE Document 3 MOTION to Stay pending appeal.. Use the event type Affirmation in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. ***REMINDER*** - Motion to Stay WAS MOT FILED. First file Motion, then file and link any supporting documents. (db) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
Thu 04/18 10:43 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Anne Julia Penachio to RE-FILE Document 4 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Document linked to filing error. (db) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Stay
Wed 04/17 10:18 AM
MOTION to Stay pending appeal . Document filed by Davoud Ghatanfard..(Penachio, Anne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Bankruptcy Court Docket, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B 9019 Motion with Rosey, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C Appeal Decision, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D April 4, 2024 hearing Transcript, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E April 10, 2024 hearing Transcript, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F Order converting case, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G Endorsed letter to Lane, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H Pavle Zivcovic Proof of Claim, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I Class Action Claimants Proof of Claim, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J David Ghatanfard's Declaration in support of stay | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/16 11:40 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar) |
|
1 | 1
appeal
Bankruptcy Appeal
Tue 04/16 11:37 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Sean H. Lane dated April 11, 2024. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 23-B-22840 (SHL). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Davoud Ghatanfard..(bkar) |
|
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/16 11:40 AM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (bkar) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/16 11:48 AM
Case Designated ECF. (bkar) |