Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Younge
Case #: 2:24-cv-01564
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2024
Terminated:Aug 22, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 13, 2024 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant
NORTHEAST LANDSCAPING & TREE SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff
UNION LEASING, INC.
Represented By
NICOLA G. SUGLIA
Fleischer, Fleischer & Suglia, P.C.
contact info
ALLISON L. DOMOWITCH
Fleischer, Fleischer & Suglia, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
9 9 order Judgment - Default Thu 08/22 10:01 AM
ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT. ORDER THAT FINAL JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF, UNION LEASING, INC. AND AGAINST DEFENDANT, NORTHEAST LANDSCAPING & TREE SERVICES, INC. IN THE AMOUNT OF $704,287.51. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 8/21/24. 8/22/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
8 8 misc Request for Default Judgment Thu 08/15 8:32 AM
Request for Default Judgment UNION LEASING, INC. against NORTHEAST LANDSCAPING & TREE SERVICES, INC..(DOMOWITCH, ALLISON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 01, 2024
7 7 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 07/01 12:22 PM
DEFAULT BY NORTHEAST LANDSCAPING & TREE SERVICES, INC. FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (bw)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Request for Default Mon 07/01 10:54 AM
Request for Default UNION LEASING, INC. against NORTHEAST LANDSCAPING & TREE SERVICES, INC..(DOMOWITCH, ALLISON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Mon 07/01 10:08 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Guaranteed Subpoena Service, Inc. re: served Summons, Complaint upon Northeast Landscaping & Tree Services, Inc. d/b/a NELTS, Inc., c/o James A. Hall, IV, Esq., Registered Agent by Personal on 6/6/24 (DOMOWITCH, ALLISON)
Related: [-]
misc Default Entered Mon 07/01 12:22 PM
Default Entered (bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/17 7:44 AM
Summons Issued as to NORTHEAST LANDSCAPING & TREE SERVICES, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 4/17/24 (bw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
3 3 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Tue 04/16 3:00 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Sasser Family Holdings, Inc. by UNION LEASING, INC..(DOMOWITCH, ALLISON)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/16 2:17 PM
NOTICE by UNION LEASING, INC. re Attorney Required Forms, Completed Designation Form (SUGLIA, NICOLA)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 04/16 12:58 PM
COMPLAINT against NORTHEAST LANDSCAPING & TREE SERVICES, INC. d/b/a NELTS INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BPAEDC-17401662.), filed by UNION LEASING, INC. d/b/a EXPRESS 4X4 TRUCK RENTAL, EXPRESS CAR & TRUCK RENTAL, AS SERVICING AGENT FOR UNION LEASING TRUST.(SUGLIA, NICOLA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Designation Form
misc Attorney Required Forms Tue 04/16 2:11 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Form is blank and needs to be filled out, in its entirety. (sbt)
Related: [-]