May v. McDermott
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | J P Stadtmueller |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00450 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Attachments
Thu 05/02 8:05 AM
Additional Grounds for Habeas Corpus by Edith Mae May re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (rcm) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Tue 04/30 12:25 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Edith Mae May. (rcm) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/30 11:40 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Edith Mae May. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (rcm) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate
Tue 04/16 11:07 AM
LETTER from the clerk to Edith Mae May re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (rcm) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Tue 04/16 10:58 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Edith Mae May. (rcm) |
|
2 | 2
respm
Brief (Non-Motion)
Tue 04/16 10:57 AM
BRIEF in Support filed by Edith Mae May re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (rcm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 04/16 10:56 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Edith Mae May.(rcm) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |