Nagengast v. Fiorello
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Brendan Abell Hurson |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01103 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | District Court of Maryland for Baltimore County, D-08-CV-24-014446 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Nicholas Fiorello
United States Department of Labor 36 South Charles Street 4th Floor
Baltimore, MD 21201 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Annette Nagengast
10 West Kingston Park Lane
Baltimore, MD 21220 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/25 12:36 PM
NOTICE by Nicholas Fiorello re2 Local Rule 103.5(Farber, Molissa) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment State Court File Summary, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Notice of Removal Package, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment Certified Mail Card, | ||
Att: 4 Attachment State Court Writ of Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Attachment State Court Complaint | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 04/18 11:06 AM
ORDER granting3 Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to Respond re3 Complaint; Nicholas Fiorello answer due 6/17/2024. Signed by District Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 4/18/2024. (c/m p 4/18/24 ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
corresp
Miscellaneous
Tue 04/16 2:00 PM
Correspondence from Clerk re: Removal Notification Letter (c/m p 4/16/24 ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions
Tue 04/16 1:59 PM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 1:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Nicholas Fiorello, filed by Annette Nagengast. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 04/16 1:41 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Nicholas Fiorello(Farber, Molissa) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Local Rule
Tue 04/16 1:32 PM
Local Rule 103.5(Farber, Molissa) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/16 1:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Maryland for Baltimore County, case number D-08-CV-24-014446., filed by Nicholas Fiorello.(Farber, Molissa) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Summons, | ||
Att: 3 State Court Complaint | ||
utility
Remark - State Court Docs
Tue 04/16 1:58 PM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE DISTRICT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |