Williams v. Ervin et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul D Borman |
Referred: | Kimberly G Altman |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-10998 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Oakland County Circuit Court, 24-205401-NI |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Samuel Ervin
|
|
Defendant
Zupa Global, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Scott Williams
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/29 12:50 PM
ORDER Requiring Parties to Meet and File Joint Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 Plan. ( Due by 5/23/2024 ) Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (EPar) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
respoth
Objection - Free
Fri 04/26 9:50 AM
OBJECTION to8 Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Fracassi, Roderick) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 04/23 2:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Bates, Matthew) Modified on 4/23/2024 (JHea) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Affirmative Defenses
Tue 04/23 1:59 PM
AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by All Plaintiffs (Bates, Matthew) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
respoth
Response - Free
Fri 04/19 1:02 PM
RESPONSE to4 Order Relative to Defendants' Removal by All Defendants. (Fracassi, Roderick) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Fri 04/19 12:39 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Zupa Global, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Zupa Global, Inc. for Zupa Global, Inc.. (Fracassi, Roderick) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/18 4:00 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Fracassi, Roderick) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Filing Fee Not Paid*
Thu 04/18 10:51 AM
Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 5/2/2024 (MSyl) |
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Thu 04/18 10:53 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (MSyl) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/18 12:42 PM
STANDING ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF INFORMATION REGARDING REMOVAL. Response due 4/24/2024; Reply due 5/1/2024. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (SPin) |
|
2 | 2
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/17 3:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re1 Notice of Removal, by All Defendants (Fracassi, Roderick) |
|
misc
Fee Received
Mon 04/22 1:12 PM
FILING FEE Received in the amount of 405.00 by Samuel Ervin, Zupa Global, Inc. - Receipt No. 150010022 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (BHan) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Notice of Removal
Tue 04/16 1:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 24-205401-NI. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Fracassi, Roderick) |