inContact, Inc. v. Tactical Digital Corporation et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jesse M Furman |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02861 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Tactical Digital Corporation
|
|
Defendant
The Wish Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wish Collaboration, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
inContact, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Thu 04/18 4:27 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on July 16, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. Initial Conference set for 7/16/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/18/2024) (ate) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 11:09 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wish Collaboration, Inc...(jgo) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 11:08 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Wish Group, Inc...(jgo) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 11:07 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tactical Digital Corporation..(jgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/17 11:05 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/17 11:06 AM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/17 11:07 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/16 12:27 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wish Collaboration, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by inContact, Inc.. |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/16 12:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Wish Group, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by inContact, Inc.. |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/16 12:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tactical Digital Corporation, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by inContact, Inc.. |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/16 12:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. |
|
2 | 2
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/16 12:21 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent NICE Ltd for inContact, Inc.. Document filed by inContact, Inc.. |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 12:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Tactical Digital Corporation, The Wish Group, Inc., Wish Collaboration, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29225037)Document filed by inContact, Inc.. |