Voskin et al v. Zeus Networks, LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew L Carter, Jr |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02862 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 1:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Business Entities A-J
|
|
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Zeus Networks, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Umed Makhsumov
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ella Voskin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/22 4:35 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zeus Networks, LLC..(jgo) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/19 2:49 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zeus Networks, LLC, re:3 Complaint. Document filed by Umed Makhsumov, Ella Voskin..(Lurie, Joshua) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/19 2:41 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joshua Matthew Lurie to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Plaintiff name error in caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/18 11:11 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zeus Networks, LLC, re:3 Complaint. Document filed by Umed Makhsumov, Ella Voskin..(Lurie, Joshua) Modified on 4/19/2024 (sj) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 3:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Business Entities A-J, John and Jane Does 1-10, Zeus Networks, LLC. Document filed by Ella Voskin, Umed Makhsumov..(Lurie, Joshua) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Wed 04/17 11:26 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joshua Matthew Lurie to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/17 11:28 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/17 11:30 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/17 11:30 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/16 1:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lurie, Joshua) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 12:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Zeus Networks, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-29225226)Document filed by Ella Voskin, Umed Makhsumov..(Lurie, Joshua) |