Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:24-bk-00162

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Lori V Vaughan
Case #: 6:24-ap-00037
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2024
Terminated:Aug 13, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ernest Smalls, Jr
1821 Trophy Bass Way
Kissimmee, FL 34746
Represented By
Ernest Smalls, Jr
contact info
Defendant
Latoria Marie Smalls
1821 Trophy Bass Way
Kissimmee, FL 34746
Represented By
Latoria Marie Smalls
contact info
Plaintiff
AmeriFirst Finance
1620 Dodge Street Stop 8116
Omaha, NE 68197
Represented By
Eric S Haug
Proper Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/13 7:40 AM
Adversary Case 6:24-ap-37 Closed. (Penny)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
7 7 order Judgment Thu 07/25 4:08 PM
Agreed Final Judgment in Favor of Amerifirst Amount Awarded: $129,521.74 Related [+]. Service Instructions: Eric Haug is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Faye)
Related: [-] 6 ,5
Thursday, July 18, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 07/18 4:18 PM
Agreed Order Approving Joint Stipulation of Nondischargeability Related [+]. Service Instructions: Eric Haug is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Faye)
Related: [-] 5
Friday, July 05, 2024
5 5 misc Stipulation (AP) Fri 07/05 5:06 PM
Joint Stipulation of Nondischargeability Filed by Eric S Haug on behalf of Plaintiff AmeriFirst Finance. (Haug, Eric)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed Fri 07/05 5:04 PM
Service Executed on Ernest Smalls, Jr., Latoria Marie Smalls, and Lewis M. Roberts, their bankruptcy attorney of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Eric S Haug on behalf of Plaintiff AmeriFirst Finance. (Haug, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
3 3 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Tue 04/16 10:56 AM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 05/16/2024. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A Pretrial/Status Conference will be held on August 6, 2024, at 10:15 AM. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 04/15 11:59 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Corporate parents added to case: First National of Nebraska, Inc. Filed by Eric S Haug on behalf of Plaintiff AmeriFirst Finance. (Haug, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Mon 04/15 11:47 PM
Complaint by AmeriFirst Finance against Ernest Smalls Jr, Latoria Marie Smalls. (Fee Paid.) Nature of Suit: [62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)]. (Haug, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A