Rosa's Sports Bar LLC
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-13853 |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Rosa's Sports Bar LLC
317 Broadway
Passaic, NJ 07055-2724 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Fri 04/26 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/25/2024. (Admin.) |
|
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 04/26 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 04/25/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
court
Notice of Hearing (Upload)
Mon 04/22 7:11 PM
NOTICE OF STATUS HEARING AND § 1111(b) ELECTION DEADLINE 11 U.S.C. § 1188(a) STATUS HEARING. . The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Section 1111(b) Election Deadline is no later than 14 days from the filing of the debtors plan. Hearing scheduled for 5/30/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. Subchapter V Status Report Due By 5/16/2024: (rah) |
|
11 | 11
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Mon 04/22 6:45 PM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11.Trustee Mark Edward Hall appointed to case. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/15/2024 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 6/25/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/15/2024. (rah) |
|
10 | 10
trustee
Notice Appointing Trustee
Mon 04/22 2:48 PM
Notice of Appointment of Mark Edward Hall as Subchapter V Trustee filed by U.S. Trustee. U.S. Trustee. (United States Trustee, by Martha Hildebrandt, Assistant United States Trustee) |
|
Att: 1 Verified Statement of Mark E. Hall | ||
Saturday, April 20, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sun 04/21 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/20/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sat 04/20 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Show Cause
Thu 04/18 2:44 PM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/18/2024. Hearing scheduled for 5/7/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (dlr) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Document
Wed 04/17 7:34 PM
Document re: Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing filed by Steven D. Pertuz on behalf of Rosa's Sports Bar LLC. (Pertuz, Steven) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Document
Wed 04/17 7:32 PM
Document re: Statement Regarding Authority To Sign And File Petition filed by Steven D. Pertuz on behalf of Rosa's Sports Bar LLC. (Pertuz, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Retention (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)
Wed 04/17 7:22 PM
Application For Retention of Professional Steven D. Pertuz, LLC as Counsel For Debtor In Possession Filed by Steven D. Pertuz on behalf of Rosa's Sports Bar LLC. Objections due by 5/7/2024. (Pertuz, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Certification | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
3 | 3
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Wed 04/17 2:18 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Michael A. Artis on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Artis, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
order
Show Cause
Wed 04/17 11:08 AM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/17/2024. Hearing scheduled for 5/7/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (dlr) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
6
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 04/16 1:43 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Steven D. Pertuz on behalf of Rosa's Sports Bar LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 07/15/2024. (Pertuz, Steven) |
|
crditcrd
Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Tue 04/16 1:49 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-13853 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number B46643983, fee amount $ 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |