California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:24-cv-02236
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2024
Terminated:Aug 13, 2024
Case in other court:Small Claims Court, Superior Court of CA, Sonoma, MSC-192917
Last checked: Sunday Oct 13, 2024 2:04 AM PDT
Defendant
Cynthia Hom
Represented By
Jevechius Doherty Bernardoni
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Santa Rosa Community Health- Dutton Campus
Represented By
Jevechius Doherty Bernardoni
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Jevechius Doherty Bernardoni
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Lana Welton
301 Wilson Street
Santa Rosa, CA 95402

GPO May 13 2024
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 7/1/2024. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on 5/13/2024. (sklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, August 23, 2024
27 27 misc Mail Returned Fri 08/23 4:03 PM
Mail sent to Lana Welton returned as undeliverable re25 Judgment,24 Order (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
26 26 misc Mail Returned Wed 08/14 4:41 PM
Mail sent to Lana Welton returned as undeliverable re21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Notice of Removal filed by Santa Rosa Community Health- Dutton Campus, Cynthia Hom,6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
25 25 order Judgment Tue 08/13 9:38 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Chhabria on 8/13/2024. (vclc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 08/13 9:33 AM
Order by Judge Vince Chhabria adopting 21 Report and Recommendations. (vclc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
23 23 misc Mail Returned Fri 07/26 1:22 PM
Mail sent to Lana Welton returned as undeliverable re22 Order Reassigning Case (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/16 11:21 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/16/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Monday, July 15, 2024
21 21 motion Report and Recommendations Order Reassigning Case Mon 07/15 4:17 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE TO A DISTRICT JUDGE. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Santa Rosa Community Health- Dutton Campus, Cynthia Hom, 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. Objections due by 7/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/15/2024. (bxl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
20 20 misc Mail Returned Fri 06/14 2:26 PM
Mail sent to Lana Welton returned as undeliverable re19 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
19 19 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 06/06 1:53 PM
CLERK'S THIRD NOTICE re Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/20/2024 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (bxl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
18 18 misc Mail Returned Sun 05/26 3:24 PM
Mail sent to Lana Welton returned as undeliverable re15 Order to Show Cause,. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
17 17 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 05/15 1:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Bernardoni, Jevechius)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
16 16 misc Mail Returned Wed 05/15 12:23 PM
Mail sent to Lana Welton returned as undeliverable re11 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination,,. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 05/13 2:11 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 7/1/2024. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on 5/13/2024. (sklc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
14 14 oth_sup Declaration in Support Mon 05/13 12:22 PM
Declaration of Jevechius D. Bernardoni in Support of13 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byUnited States of America. Related [+] (Bernardoni, Jevechius)
Related: [-] 13
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
13 13 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Mon 05/13 12:11 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byUnited States of America. (Bernardoni, Jevechius)
Related: [-] 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 05/13 2:14 PM
Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss vacated in light of the Order to Show Cause15 . (sklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
12 12 misc Mail Returned Fri 05/03 8:46 AM
Mail sent to Lana Welton returned as undeliverable re9 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination,,. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 04/30 2:45 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/20/2024 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (bxl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
10 10 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 04/23 4:59 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/15/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (far, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 04/22 3:47 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/29/2024 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (bxl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 04/22 2:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Bernardoni, Jevechius)
Related: [-]
7 7 oth_sup Declaration in Support Mon 04/22 2:23 PM
Declaration of Meredith Torres in Support of6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byUnited States of America. Related [+] (Bernardoni, Jevechius)
Related: [-] 6
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
6 6 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 04/22 2:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2024 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 5/6/2024. Replies due by 5/13/2024.(Bernardoni, Jevechius)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 04/22 11:22 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Bernardoni, Jevechius)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 04/22 10:08 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/6/2024. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 04/18 10:15 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filing fee not paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Santa Rosa Community Health- Dutton Campus, Cynthia Hom (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
3 3 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 04/16 3:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cynthia Hom, Santa Rosa Community Health- Dutton Campus re1 Notice of Removal,2 Notice (Other) (Bernardoni, Jevechius)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/16 10:20 AM
CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO 42 U.S.C. § 233(c) by Cynthia Hom, Santa Rosa Community Health- Dutton Campus (Bernardoni, Jevechius) Modified on 4/16/2024 (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 04/16 10:12 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Small Claims Court, Superior Court of CA, Sonoma. Their case number is MSC-192917. (). Filed by Cynthia Hom, Santa Rosa Community Health- Dutton Campus.(Bernardoni, Jevechius)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet