MITCHELL v. LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Maxine M Chesney |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02240 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alameda County Superior Court, 24CV059042 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 11:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC.
|
|
Defendant
LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
REBECCA MITCHELL
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Wed 05/01 10:42 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2024. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/1/2024. (tl, COURT STAFF) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 05/01 9:30 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Tue 04/30 11:26 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bxl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/29 2:52 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rebecca Mitchell.. (Bradley, Shanie) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/19 9:57 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.. (Breuer, Andrea) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 04/18 1:29 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2024 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Videoconference Only. (slh, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 04/18 11:00 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/2/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Thu 04/18 1:58 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. Parties added to action incorrectly . Counsel is reminded not to add parties in all caps. For future reference, please refer to https://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. See Guide to E-Filing New Civil Cases (Section III.c Adding Parties). Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. (slh, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 04/16 10:59 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lowe's Companies, Inc. for LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. (Breuer, Andrea) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 04/16 10:57 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. (Breuer, Andrea) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/16 10:56 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC . (Breuer, Andrea) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/16 10:54 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 24CV059042. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19323819). Filed by LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC.(Breuer, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit |