IN RE: 23ANDME, Inc., Customer Data Security Breach Litigation
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward M Chen |
Case #: | 3:24-md-03098 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 04/30 6:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 23andMe, Inc. re11 Order Pretrial Order No. 1: Initial Conference and Hearing on Motions to Appoint (Ballon, Ian) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/26 9:17 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gia Jung (Jung, Gia) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/26 9:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tyson Carl Redenbarger |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Thu 04/25 11:41 PM
Declaration of Rafey S. Balabanian in Support of30 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,, filed byJ. L., David Melvin. (Balabanian, Rafey) |
|
30 | 30
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Thu 04/25 11:40 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byJ. L., David Melvin.(Balabanian, Rafey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Relief and Claims Rates of Other Applicants Cases | ||
29 | 29
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Thu 04/25 9:50 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byRudy K Thompson. (Molumphy, Mark) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Thu 04/25 9:13 PM
REPLY filed byJohn Doe, John Q. Public, Richard Roe. (Gardner, Melissa) |
|
27 | 27
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Thu 04/25 8:41 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byPolina Ioffe. (Schubert, Amber) |
|
26 | 26
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Thu 04/25 6:03 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byMax Alperstein, Dhaman Gill, Arya Shoaee, David Tulchinsky. (Van Note, Laura) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Statement
Thu 04/25 5:56 PM
Statement Re Selection of Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel Hearing on 5/30/24 and ISO Ongoing Settlement Negotiations by 23ANDME Holding Co, 23andMe, Inc.. (Ballon, Ian) |
|
24 | 24
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Thu 04/25 5:47 PM
REPLY filed byBonnie Eden. (Blatt, Gayle) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Thu 04/25 5:09 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byCamie Picha.(Laufenberg, Cari) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 04/24 12:31 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Application of Norman E. Siegel to Serve as Settlement Counsel and Interim Class Counsel) filed by Claire Paddy, Neil Haven. (Siegel, Norman) |
|
21 | 21
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Wed 04/24 11:57 AM
Declaration of M. Anderson Berry in Support of20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Gayle M. Blatt and M. Anderson Berry as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Melissa K. Emert and Maureen K. Berg as Executive Committee Members for the Class JOINT DECLARATION WITH GAYLE M. BLATT filed byAdriane Farmer, Brianna Sorensen. (Berry, M.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Bio Casey Gerry Firm, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Bio ALF Firm, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Bio KGG Firm, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Bio LGN Firm | ||
20 | 20
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 04/24 11:52 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Gayle M. Blatt and M. Anderson Berry as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Melissa K. Emert and Maureen K. Berg as Executive Committee Members for the Class filed by Adriane Farmer, Brianna Sorensen.(Berry, M.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Time Keeping Protocol, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Case Plan | ||
19 | 19
motion
Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
Wed 04/24 11:23 AM
MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION TO APPOINT CARI CAMPEN LAUFENBERG AS INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL filed by Camie Picha. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 5/8/2024. Replies due by 5/15/2024.(Laufenberg, Cari) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Cari Laufenberg, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
Wed 04/24 10:32 AM
First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Maureen M. Brady filed by J.S.. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2024 01:30 PM before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 5/8/2024. Replies due by 5/15/2024.(Zinns, Sharon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit MAureen M. Brady CV | ||
17 | 17
motion
Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
Wed 04/24 10:24 AM
First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Sharon J. Zinns filed by J.S.. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2024 01:30 PM before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 5/8/2024. Replies due by 5/15/2024. (Zinns, Sharon) |
|
16 | 16
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Wed 04/24 6:58 AM
Declaration of Carey Alexander in Support of15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion to Appoint Carey Alexander as State/Federal Liaison Counsel filed byEmily Beale, Anna DaVeiga, Tracy Scott. (Alexander, Carey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 04/24 6:56 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion to Appoint Carey Alexander as State/Federal Liaison Counsel filed by Emily Beale, Anna DaVeiga, Tracy Scott. (Alexander, Carey) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 04/23 7:17 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Dorothy P. Antullis of Robbins Geller and Melissa A. Gardner of Lieff Cabraser filed by John Doe, John Q. Public, Richard Roe.(Gardner, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Joint Declaration of Dorothy P. Antullis and Melissa A. Gardner, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 (Robbins Geller Practice Group Resume and Biographies), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 (Lieff Cabraser Firm Resume) | ||
13 | 13
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom
Tue 04/23 4:43 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION HEARING VIA ZOOM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2024, at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel set for 5/30/2024, at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. These proceedings will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO LOG INTO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 1:15 PM Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
Tue 04/23 4:37 PM
MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP and Bottini & Bottini, Inc.) filed by Rudy K Thompson. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 4/25/2024.(Molumphy, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Mark C. Molumphy and Francis A. Bottini, Jr., | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
5
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/23 3:35 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1: Initial Conference and Hearing on Motions to Appoint. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/23/2024. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) |
|
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/23 2:29 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) by MDL Panel on 4/22/24.(as, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/22 7:04 PM
NOTICE by David Melvin, J. L. re8 Order - Melvin Plaintiffs Notice of Filing of Motion to Appoint interim Leadership of Class Action(Wade-Scott, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Motion to Appoint Interim Leadership of Class Action, Exhibits 1-2, Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Rafey S. Balabanian, Exhibit A to Balabanian Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Proof of Service of Motion to Appoint and Balabanian Declaration | ||
8 | 8
5
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/22 2:03 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO TRANSFER CASE 24-cv-487 to 24-MD-3098. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/22/2024. (vla, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order Relating Case
Mon 04/22 12:18 PM
ORDER RELATING/TRANSFERRING CASE 24-cv-1418 to 24-md-3098. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/22/2024. (vla, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order Relating Case
Mon 04/22 10:01 AM
ORDER RELATING/TRANSFERRING CASE 24-cv-2319 to 24-md-3098. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/22/2024. (vla, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 04/19 11:00 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Tyrell Brown. |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael R. Reese, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Thu 04/18 6:26 PM
Declaration of Hassan A. Zavareei in Support of3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion to Appoint Hassan A. Zavareei as Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed byMichele Bacus. (Zavareei, Hassan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Firm Resume | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Thu 04/18 6:24 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion to Appoint Hassan A. Zavareei as Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed by Michele Bacus.(Zavareei, Hassan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Trial Plan, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/18 6:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hassan Ali Zavareei and Sabita J. Soneji for Plaintiff Michele Bacus (Zavareei, Hassan) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
4
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/16 10:16 AM
TRANSFER ORDER by MDL Panel on 4/12/24 ORDER. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/24. (as, COURT STAFF) |