Erchonia Corporation LLC v. Skinny Me America LLC
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas P Barber |
Referred: | Amanda Arnold Sansone |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00924 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 2:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Skinny Me America LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Erchonia Corporation LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 04/26 11:15 PM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 04/26 11:15 PM
NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
misc
Disbursement Voucher / Refund
Mon 04/22 11:41 AM
REFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number AFLMDC-21987959 refunded in the amount of $ $405.00 paid to Scott W Dangler.. (NLC) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Patent/Trademark Report
Wed 04/17 3:01 PM
Patent Report electronically sent to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ABM) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons issued
Wed 04/17 2:59 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Skinny Me America LLC. (ABM) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Wed 04/17 11:26 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Erchonia Corporation LLC. Related case(s): No (Dangler, Scott) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/17 11:08 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Erchonia Corporation LLC. (Dangler, Scott) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Wed 04/17 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Scott Warren Dangler on behalf of Erchonia Corporation LLC. Lead Counsel: Scott W Dangler. (Dangler, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 04/16 2:54 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Scott Warren Dangler of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/16 2:52 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:24-cv-924-TPB-AAS. (AJS) |
|
1 | 1
18
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 1:18 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Skinny Me America LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21988023) filed by Erchonia Corporation LLC.(Dangler, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - US Patent 9149650, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - US Patent 7947067, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons |