White v. Amazon.com Services, LLC
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | David L Bunning |
Referred: | Candace J Smith |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00056 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Kenton Circuit, 24-CI-00540 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 2:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Amazon.com Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paulette White
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 8:46 AM
VIRTUAL ORDER: granting8 MOTION for Ashley E. Baxter to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com Services, LLC, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 4/29/2024. (TDB) |
|
notice
Notice for Attorney to Request E-Filing Privileges
Mon 04/29 8:51 AM
NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Ashley E. Baxter: re 9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Ashley E. Baxter (TDB) |
||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
misc
Bar Status Check
Fri 04/26 9:01 AM
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Ashley E. Baxter re8 MOTION for Ashley E. Baxter to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amazon.com Services, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5823940). (TDB) |
||
utility
Motion Submitted
Fri 04/26 9:02 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re8 MOTION for Ashley E. Baxter to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amazon.com Services, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5823940) (TDB) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 3:07 PM
MOTION for Ashley E. Baxter to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amazon.com Services, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5823940)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Sweitzer, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of A. Baxter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - PA Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Agreed Order
Mon 04/22 8:48 AM
VIRTUAL ORDER: The parties' proposed Agreed Order Pursuant to Local Rule 7.16 is hereby APPROVED. Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before June 17, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 4/22/2024. (TDB) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
utility
Motion Submitted
Wed 04/17 12:34 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re6 Proposed Agreed Order Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1 for Amazon.com Services, LLC to have Extension to file answer by Amazon.com Services, LLC (TDB) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proposed Agreed Order
Tue 04/16 4:40 PM
Proposed Agreed Order Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1 by Amazon.com Services, LLC. (Sweitzer, Stephanie) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1
Tue 04/16 1:34 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amazon.com Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc., Other Affiliate Amazon.com Sales, Inc. for Amazon.com Services, LLC.. (Sweitzer, Stephanie) |
|
misc
Conflict Check
Tue 04/16 9:30 AM
Conflict Check run. (TBB) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Attorney Notice
Tue 04/16 10:11 AM
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Ashley E. Baxter by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (TBB) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/16 9:41 AM
STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011. (TBB) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/16 9:27 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kenton Circuit, case number 24-CI-00540. (Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5815179), filed by Amazon.com Services, LLC.(TBB) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit State Court Record, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit State Court Declaration Brown, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit State Court Declaration Sweitzer | ||
notice
Notice for Attorney to Update Address
Tue 04/16 9:44 AM
NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO UPDATE ADDRESS to P. Stewart Abney: It appears the address listed on your filing1 Notice of Removal, is different than the address registered with our Court. Pursuant to the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures governing ECF, a request to update your address must be processed through your PACER account. Please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information or contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR (TBB) |