Thompson v. Chubb European Group SE
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brandon S Long |
Referred: | Janis Van Meerveld |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00946 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, 24-01668 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 1:13 PM CDT |
Defendant
Chubb European Group SE
|
|
Plaintiff
Jordan Thompson
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Tue 04/30 4:22 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the7 motion of Plaintiff Jordan Thompson to substitute counsel of record is GRANTED. David B. Wheeler is withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiff, and Jennifer Crose is enrolled as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 04/30/2024. (js) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Substitute Attorney
Mon 04/29 3:06 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jennifer Crose to be substituted in place of David B. Wheeler by Jordan Thompson.Attorney Jennifer L. Crose added to party Jordan Thompson(pty:pla).(Crose, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Statement of Corporate Disclosure
Tue 04/23 1:01 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Chubb European Group SE identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for Chubb European Group SE (Meese, Rachel) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Compliance
Tue 04/23 12:59 PM
Notice of Compliance Response to Rec. Doc. 3 by Chubb European Group SE re3 Order. (Meese, Rachel) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
30+
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/17 12:28 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to Ida CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(js) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/17 12:27 PM
DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal filed by Chubb European Group SE.(js) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 04/16 3:45 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Brandon S. Long and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (meb) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/16 2:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2024-01668 (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Chubb European Group SE.Attorney Rachel Ann Meese added to party Chubb European Group SE(pty:dft).(Meese, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 04/16 3:37 PM
Filing fee received from Chaffe McCall LLC: $ 405.00 Receipt No 6579 (ess) |