New Hampshire District Court
Judge:Landya B Mccafferty
Case #: 1:24-cv-00103
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2024
Terminated:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Oct 13, 2024 5:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Matthew Bachler
Represented By
Robert Joseph Dietel
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Nathan Midolo Midolo
Upton & Hatfield LLP
contact info
Emily Catherine Goering
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Defendant
Jane Johnson
Represented By
Robert Joseph Dietel
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Nathan Midolo Midolo
Upton & Hatfield LLP
contact info
Emily Catherine Goering
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Defendant
Ann Karasinski
Represented By
Robert Joseph Dietel
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Nathan Midolo Midolo
Upton & Hatfield LLP
contact info
Emily Catherine Goering
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Defendant
Sylvester Karasinski
Represented By
Robert Joseph Dietel
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Nathan Midolo Midolo
Upton & Hatfield LLP
contact info
Emily Catherine Goering
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Defendant
Richard Lane
Represented By
Robert Joseph Dietel
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Nathan Midolo Midolo
Upton & Hatfield LLP
contact info
Emily Catherine Goering
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Defendant
Steve Malone
Represented By
Robert Joseph Dietel
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Nathan Midolo Midolo
Upton & Hatfield LLP
contact info
Emily Catherine Goering
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Defendant
Robert Mitchell
Represented By
Robert Joseph Dietel
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Nathan Midolo Midolo
Upton & Hatfield LLP
contact info
Emily Catherine Goering
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Defendant
Adam Mulhearn
Represented By
Robert Joseph Dietel
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Nathan Midolo Midolo
Upton & Hatfield LLP
contact info
Emily Catherine Goering
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Defendant
Bryan Rudgers
Represented By
Robert Joseph Dietel
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Nathan Midolo Midolo
Upton & Hatfield LLP
contact info
Emily Catherine Goering
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Defendant
Swanzey, NH, Town of
Represented By
Robert Joseph Dietel
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Nathan Midolo Midolo
Upton & Hatfield LLP
contact info
Emily Catherine Goering
Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Avanru Development Group, Inc.
Represented By
Robert H. Miller
Sheehan Phinney Bass & Green PA
contact info
James P. Harris
Sheehan Phinney Bass & Green PA
contact info

GPO Apr 10 2025
ORDER granting 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. For the reasons explained within, defendants' motion to dismiss is hereby granted. Counts I & II are dismissed with prejudice. Counts III-VII are dismissed without prejudice. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
35 35 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 05/08 8:32 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to33 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by Avanru Development Group, Inc..( Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ANHDC-2632331.) [NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the Forms & Notices section of the First Circuit website at www.ca1.uscourts.gov, MUST be completed and submitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit.] NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel should register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf/. Counsel should also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf (Harris, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
34 34 order Judgment Tue 05/06 5:20 PM
JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with 33 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Tracy A. Uhrin, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed). (de)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
33 33 32 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 04/10 1:37 PM
ORDER granting 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. For the reasons explained within, defendants' motion to dismiss is hereby granted. Counts I & II are dismissed with prejudice. Counts III-VII are dismissed without prejudice. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
order Endorsed Order - not on motion Mon 01/06 2:25 PM
ENDORSED ORDER. Text of Order: During the January 6, 2025 discovery status conference, the parties agreed that they are free to propound discovery requests, but discovery will otherwise be stayed until either March 31, 2025 or the issuance of an order on the motion to dismiss, whichever occurs first. Responses to discovery requests will be due 30 days after the stay is lifted. If the parties are unable to reach an agreement regarding the use of a forensic examiner as of the time the stay is lifted, they may request a discovery conference with the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(de)
Related: [-]
minutes Discovery Status Conference Mon 01/06 3:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/6/2025. (Court Reporter: Liza Dubois) (Pltfs Atty: James Harris, Robert Miller) (Defts Atty: Emily Goering)(Total Hearing Time: 23 min.) (kad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
notice Hearing Notice Thu 12/26 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Hearing. Discovery Status Conference via Video set for 1/6/2025 01:00 PM before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. (kad)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
32 32 misc Miscellaneous Filing Mon 11/25 12:52 PM
Joint Statement Regarding E-Discovery Forensic Collection by Avanru Development Group, Inc.(Harris, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
31 31 respm Surreply to Reply Tue 10/08 4:57 PM
SURREPLY to Reply to24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Avanru Development Group, Inc.. (Miller, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
30 30 respm Reply to Objection to Motion Thu 10/03 11:53 AM
REPLY to Objection to Motion re24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Matthew Bachler, Jane Johnson, Ann Karasinski, Sylvester Karasinski, Richard Lane, Steve Malone, Robert Mitchell, Adam Mulhearn, Bryan Rudgers, Swanzey, NH, Town of. Surreply due by 10/8/2024. (Goering, Emily)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
order Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond Thu 09/19 4:10 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 29 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond, 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.Follow up on Objection on 10/3/2024. (vln)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
29 29 motion Extend Time to Object/Respond Mon 09/16 12:37 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to28 Objection to Motion, to October 3, 2024 filed by Matthew Bachler, Jane Johnson, Ann Karasinski, Sylvester Karasinski, Richard Lane, Steve Malone, Robert Mitchell, Adam Mulhearn, Bryan Rudgers, Swanzey, NH, Town of.(Goering, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
28 28 respm Objection to Motion Fri 09/13 3:39 PM
OBJECTION to24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Related [+] filed by Avanru Development Group, Inc.. Follow up on Reply on 9/20/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Miller, Robert)
Related: [-] places Doc #27 to correct typo in subheading #5
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law
Thursday, September 12, 2024
27 27 respm Objection to Motion Thu 09/12 4:45 PM
OBJECTION to24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Avanru Development Group, Inc.. Follow up on Reply on 9/19/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Miller, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law Memorandum of Law Opposing Motion
Monday, July 29, 2024
order Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond Mon 07/29 1:01 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 26 Partially Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond re 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to September 12, 2024. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.Follow up on Objection on 9/12/2024. (de)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
26 26 motion Extend Time to Object/Respond Thu 07/25 9:19 AM
Partially Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to September 12, 2024 filed by Avanru Development Group, Inc..Follow up on Objection on 8/8/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Harris, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
notice Trial Notice Thu 07/18 9:57 AM
TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 8/11/2026. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 8/25/2026. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 9/15/2026 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2026 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. JERS Statement due 9/1/2026.(de)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
25 25 4 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan Wed 07/17 11:26 AM
ORDER approving with change(s) 23 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 10 days. Case Track: COMPLEX. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 3/6/2026. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 7/15/2025. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 10/31/2025. Mediation Follow Up on 7/11/2025.(de)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
24 24 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 07/15 2:25 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Matthew Bachler, Jane Johnson, Ann Karasinski, Sylvester Karasinski, Richard Lane, Steve Malone, Robert Mitchell, Adam Mulhearn, Bryan Rudgers, Swanzey, NH, Town of.Follow up on Objection on 7/29/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Goering, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law iso Motion to Dismiss
utility Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC Mon 07/15 10:05 AM
Deadline/Hearing cancelled: Pretrial Conference 07/16/2024 cancelled. Scheduling Order to Issue. (de)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
23 23 motion Discovery Plan Thu 07/11 9:58 AM
Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Avanru Development Group, Inc.. (Harris, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
notice Clerk's Notice - Filing Due Wed 07/10 10:07 AM
Clerk's Notice - No Proposed Discovery Plan Filed. The parties are directed to file a proposed discovery plan within 24 hours of this notice. Follow up on Discovery Plan 7/11/2024.(de)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
22 22 misc Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment Thu 06/27 2:07 PM
NO CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Because not all parties to the case consent to the assignment of a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, 28 U.S.C. sec. 636(c), and Local Rule 73.1(b)(2), the case will be assigned to a United States District Judge. Clerk Daniel J. Lynch. (Harris, James)
Related: [-]
utility Case Reassigned Thu 06/27 3:01 PM
Case reassigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The new case designation is: 24-cv-103-LM-AJ. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(kad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
notice Pretrial Conference Thu 06/06 8:57 AM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2024 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 7/9/2024. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
21 21 service Affidavit of Service Mon 05/20 3:36 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint and Service of Process as to Matthew Bachler filed by Avanru Development Group, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 5/16/2024.(Harris, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A- Sheriff's Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit (Affidavit) B- USPS Return Receipt
20 20 service Return of Service Unexecuted Mon 05/20 3:12 PM
Return of Service Unexecuted by Avanru Development Group, Inc. as to Matthew Bachler.(Harris, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
19 19 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 05/15 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Catherine Goering on behalf of Matthew Bachler, Jane Johnson, Ann Karasinski, Sylvester Karasinski, Richard Lane, Steve Malone, Robert Mitchell, Adam Mulhearn, Bryan Rudgers, Swanzey, NH, Town of Attorney Emily Catherine Goering added to party Matthew Bachler(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Catherine Goering added to party Jane Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Catherine Goering added to party Ann Karasinski(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Catherine Goering added to party Sylvester Karasinski(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Catherine Goering added to party Richard Lane(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Catherine Goering added to party Steve Malone(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Catherine Goering added to party Robert Mitchell(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Catherine Goering added to party Adam Mulhearn(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Catherine Goering added to party Bryan Rudgers(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Catherine Goering added to party Swanzey, NH, Town of(pty:dft).(Goering, Emily)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 05/15 1:00 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Joseph Dietel on behalf of Matthew Bachler, Jane Johnson, Ann Karasinski, Sylvester Karasinski, Richard Lane, Steve Malone, Robert Mitchell, Adam Mulhearn, Bryan Rudgers, Swanzey, NH, Town of Attorney Robert Joseph Dietel added to party Matthew Bachler(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Joseph Dietel added to party Jane Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Joseph Dietel added to party Ann Karasinski(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Joseph Dietel added to party Sylvester Karasinski(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Joseph Dietel added to party Richard Lane(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Joseph Dietel added to party Steve Malone(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Joseph Dietel added to party Robert Mitchell(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Joseph Dietel added to party Adam Mulhearn(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Joseph Dietel added to party Bryan Rudgers(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Joseph Dietel added to party Swanzey, NH, Town of(pty:dft).(Dietel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
17 17 notice Attorney Appearance Mon 05/13 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan Midolo Midolo on behalf of Swanzey, NH, Town of et al (Midolo, Nathan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer Mon 05/13 1:48 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 16 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 15, 2024 . Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. (kad)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
16 16 motion Extend Time to Answer Fri 05/10 3:14 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 15, 2024 filed by Swanzey, NH, Town of. Attorney Nathan Midolo Midolo added to party Swanzey, NH, Town of(pty:dft).(Midolo, Nathan)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Return of Service Executed Fri 05/10 1:26 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Adam Mulhearn by Avanru Development Group, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 4/25/2024. Answer Follow Up on 5/16/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Harris, James)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Return of Service Executed Fri 05/10 1:24 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Ann Karasinski by Avanru Development Group, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 4/23/2024. Answer Follow Up on 5/14/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Harris, James)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Return of Service Executed Fri 05/10 1:23 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Steve Malone by Avanru Development Group, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 4/25/2024. Answer Follow Up on 5/16/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Harris, James)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Return of Service Executed Fri 05/10 1:21 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Jane Johnson by Avanru Development Group, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 4/23/2024. Answer Follow Up on 5/14/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Harris, James)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Return of Service Executed Fri 05/10 1:20 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Richard Lane by Avanru Development Group, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 4/23/2024. Answer Follow Up on 5/14/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Harris, James)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Return of Service Executed Fri 05/10 1:18 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Bryan Rudgers by Avanru Development Group, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 4/23/2024. Answer Follow Up on 5/14/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Harris, James)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Return of Service Executed Fri 05/10 1:16 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Robert Mitchell by Avanru Development Group, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 4/23/2024. Answer Follow Up on 5/14/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Harris, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Return of Service Executed Fri 05/10 1:15 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Sylvester Karasinski by Avanru Development Group, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 4/23/2024. Answer Follow Up on 5/14/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Harris, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Return of Service Executed Fri 05/10 1:13 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Swanzey, NH, Town of (Town Clerk - Heather Estrella) by Avanru Development Group, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 4/23/2024. Answer Follow Up on 5/14/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Harris, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Return of Service Executed Fri 05/10 1:09 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Swanzey, NH, Town of (Selectboard Chair - Sylvester Karasinski) by Avanru Development Group, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 4/23/2024. Answer Follow Up on 5/14/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Harris, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 04/25 9:31 AM
Disclosure Statement by Avanru Development Group, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Harris, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
4 4 notice Attorney Appearance Tue 04/23 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert H. Miller on behalf of Avanru Development Group, Inc. Attorney Robert H. Miller added to party Avanru Development Group, Inc.(pty:pla).(Miller, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
3 3 service Summons - Waiver Issued Wed 04/17 11:33 AM
Summonses issued electronically as to Matthew Bachler, Jane Johnson, Ann Karasinski, Sylvester Karasinski, Richard Lane, Steve Malone, Robert Mitchell, Adam Mulhearn, Bryan Rudgers, Swanzey, NH, Town of. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached.(mc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice ECF,
Att: 2 Assignment to Magistrate
notice Notice - ECF Wed 04/17 11:17 AM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (mc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
2 2 notice Magistrate Judge Assignment Wed 04/17 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. MJ Consent Form Due 6/5/2024.(mc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - New Case Tue 04/16 5:23 PM
NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANHDC-2499684 filed by Avanru Development Group, Inc..(Harris, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 4/20/20 ZBA minutes,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Zoning Ordinance,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - 5/4/20 ZBA minutes,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 (P-1) - ZBA Agenda,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 (P-2) - ZBA Agenda,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 (P-3) - ZBA Agenda,
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 (P-4) - ZBA Agenda,
Att: 8 Exhibit 4 (P-5) - ZBA Agenda,
Att: 9 Exhibit 5 - Master Plan,
Att: 10 Exhibit 6 - 5/18/20 ZBA minutes,
Att: 11 Exhibit 7 - Superior Court Order,
Att: 12 Exhibit 8 - Supreme Court Order,
Att: 13 Exhibit 9 - 9/19/22 ZBA minutes,
Att: 14 Exhibit 10 - 9/23/22 ZBA Decision,
Att: 15 Exhibit 11 - Motion for Rehearing,
Att: 16 Exhibit 12 - Supplemental Motion for Rehearing,
Att: 17 Exhibit 13 - 10/17/22 ZBA minutes,
Att: 18 Exhibit 14 - 11/10/22 PB Agenda,
Att: 19 Exhibit 15 - 11/10/22 minutes,
Att: 20 Exhibit 16 - Transcript 11/20/22 PB meeting,
Att: 21 Exhibit 17 - 1/12/23 PB minutes,
Att: 22 Exhibit 18 - Transcript 1/12/23 meeting,
Att: 23 Exhibit 19 - 12/8/22 PB minutes,
Att: 24 Exhibit 20 - Transcript 12/8/22 PB meeting,
Att: 25 Exhibit 21 - 12/8/22 PB Agenda,
Att: 26 Exhibit 22 - 4/14/22 PB minutes,
Att: 27 Exhibit 23 - 12/15/22 PB minutes,
Att: 28 Exhibit 24 - 12/15/22 PB Agenda,
Att: 29 Exhibit 25 - Transcript 12/15/22 PB meeting,
Att: 30 Exhibit 26 (P-1) - PB Agenda,
Att: 31 Exhibit 26 (P-2) - PB Agenda,
Att: 32 Exhibit 27 - 2/9/23 PB minutes,
Att: 33 Exhibit 28 - PB written decision 1/17/23,
Att: 34 Exhibit 29 - 2/2/23 PB minutes,
Att: 35 Exhibit 30 - Transcript of 2/2/23 PB meeting,
Att: 36 Exhibit 31 - 2/6/23 PB Decision,
Att: 37 Exhibit 32 - 1/13/20 ZBA Agenda,
Att: 38 Exhibit 33 - 2/10/20 ZBA minutes,
Att: 39 Exhibit 34 - 5/28/20 PB minutes,
Att: 40 Exhibit 35 - 2/2/23 PB minutes,
Att: 41 Exhibit 36 - 5/18/20 ZBA Agenda,
Att: 42 Exhibit 37 - 6/16/20 ZBA minutes,
Att: 43 Exhibit 38 - 10/19/20 ZBA minutes,
Att: 44 Exhibit 39 - 8/25/22 PB minutes,
Att: 45 Exhibit 40 - 10/22/20 PB minutes,
Att: 46 Exhibit 41 (P-1) - 11/15/21 Agenda,
Att: 47 Exhibit 41 (P-2) - 11/15/21 ZBA Agenda,
Att: 48 Exhibit 42 - 11/15/21 ZBA minutes,
Att: 49 Exhibit 43 - 4/28/22 PB minutes,
Att: 50 Exhibit 44 (P-1) - 4/14/22 PB packet,
Att: 51 Exhibit 44 (P-2) - 4/14/22 PB packet,
Att: 52 Exhibit 44 (P-3) - 4/14/22 PB packet,
Att: 53 Exhibit 44 (P-4) - 4/14/22 PB packet,
Att: 54 Exhibit 44 (P-5) - 4/14/22 PB packet,
Att: 55 Exhibit 44 (P-6) - 4/14/22 PB packet,
Att: 56 Exhibit 44 (P-7) - 4/14/22 PB packet,
Att: 57 Exhibit 44 (P-8) - 4/14/22 PB packet,
Att: 58 Exhibit 44 (P-9) - 4/14/22 PB packet,
Att: 59 Exhibit 45 - 2/9/23 PB minutes,
Att: 60 Exhibit 46 - 3/17/21 ZBA decision,
Att: 61 Exhibit 47 - 5/13/21 PB meeting,
Att: 62 Exhibit 48 - 5/27/21 PB meeting,
Att: 63 Exhibit 49 - 6/1/21 Notice of Decision,
Att: 64 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 65 Summons - Waiver - Town of Swanzey, NH,
Att: 66 Summons - Waiver - Ann Karasinski,
Att: 67 Summons - Waiver - Adam Mulhearn,
Att: 68 Summons - Waiver - Bryan Rudgers,
Att: 69 Summons - Waiver - Robert Mitchell,
Att: 70 Summons - Waiver - Richard Lane,
Att: 71 Summons - Waiver - Jane Johnson,
Att: 72 Summons - Waiver - Steve Malone,
Att: 73 Summons - Waiver - Sylvester Karasinski,
Att: 74 Summons - Waiver - Matthew Bachler
utility Case Assigned Wed 04/17 11:15 AM
Case assigned to US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:24-cv-103-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
Related: [-]