In Re: Laura Christy Midtown LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Seibel |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-02867 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | USBC-SDNY, 23-B-22845 (SHL) |
Debtor
Laura Christy Midtown LLC
, |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 2:11 PM EDT |
Appellant
Laura Christy Midtown LLC
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
Pavle Zivkovic
|
Represented By
|
In Re
Laura Christy Midtown LLC
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/19 11:00 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lucas Colin Buzzard on behalf of Pavle Zivkovic..(Buzzard, Lucas) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
24
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Thu 04/18 10:18 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:5 AMENDED MOTION to Stay pending appeal . . Document filed by Laura Christy Midtown LLC..(Penachio, Anne) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Stay
Thu 04/18 9:46 AM
AMENDED MOTION to Stay pending appeal . Document filed by Laura Christy Midtown LLC..(Penachio, Anne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Bankruptcy Court Docket, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B 9019 Motion with Valbella at the Park LLC, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C Appeal Decision, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D April 4, 2024 hearing Transcript, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E April 10, 2024 hearing Transcript, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F Order converting case, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G Endorsed letter to Lane, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H Pavle Zivcovic Proof of Claim, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I Class Action Claimants Proof of Claim, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J David Ghatanfard's Declaration in support of stay | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Stay
Wed 04/17 11:42 AM
MOTION to Stay pending appeal . Document filed by Laura Christy Midtown LLC..(Penachio, Anne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Bankruptcy Court Docket, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit b 9019 Motion with Valbella at the Park LLC, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C Appeal Decision, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D April 4, 2024 hearing Transcript, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E April 10, 2024 hearing Transcript, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F Order converting case, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G Endorsed letter to Lane, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H Pavle Zivcovic Proof of Claim, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I Class Action Claimants Proof of Claim, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J David Ghatanfard's Declaration in support of stay | ||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Wed 04/17 12:00 PM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Cathy Seibel as possibly related to 1:24-cv-2858 (CS). (gp) |
||
utility
Case Accepted as Related
Wed 04/17 12:44 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:24-cv-02858-CS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Wed 04/17 12:47 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Cathy Seibel. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(tro) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/17 12:47 PM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (tro) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Statement of Relatedness
Tue 04/16 2:15 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 24-cv-2867. Document filed by Laura Christy Midtown LLC..(bkar) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/16 2:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar) |
|
1 | 1
appeal
Bankruptcy Appeal
Tue 04/16 2:04 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Sean H. Lane dated April 11, 2024. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 23-B-22845 (SHL). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Laura Christy Midtown LLC..(bkar) |
|
utility
Bankruptcy Appeal Referred as Possibly Related/Similar - Atty
Tue 04/16 2:11 PM
BANKRUPTCY APPEAL CASE REFERRED BY ATTORNEY TO Judge Cathy Seibel as possibly related to 24-cv-2858. (bkar) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/16 2:12 PM
Case Designated ECF. (bkar) |