Bailey v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Carol Sandra Moore Wells |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-01568 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 04/24 12:19 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO WITHDRAW COMPLAINT (DOCUMENT NO. 6) IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE AS CLOSED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 4/24/24. 4/24/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
respoth
Withdrawal of Claim
Tue 04/23 4:49 PM
WITHDRAWAL of Claim re1 Complaint (IFP or Government Plaintiff), by Susan Bailey. (MARZZACCO, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Procedural Order - Social Security
Wed 04/17 10:57 AM
Procedural Order 4/17/24 Entered and copies e-mailed. (dt) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/17 10:55 AM
ORDER OF 4/17/24 THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK SHALL SERVE THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 3 OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES UNDER 42 U.S.C. 405G. ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 4/17/24. 4/17/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) |
|
service
Service Event for Social Security Cases
Wed 04/17 10:57 AM
Service made electronically as to the Commissioner of Social Security and the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (dt) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Social Security Notice of Case Assignment
Tue 04/16 3:16 PM
Social Security Notice of Case Assignment(dt) |
|
Att: 1 Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/16 1:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Susan Bailey.In Forma Pauperis.(MARZZACCO, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (IFP or Government Plaintiff)
Tue 04/16 1:06 PM
COMPLAINT against MARTIN O'MALLEY, filed by Susan Bailey.(MARZZACCO, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Case Management Tracking Form, | ||
Att: 3 Designation Form Designation Form, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Unfavorable ALJ Decision, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Unfavorable AC Decision | ||
misc
Attorney Required Forms
Tue 04/16 2:16 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Signature is missing. (sbt) |