TANDE v. STONE
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Bissoon |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00572 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 2:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
TRACY STONE
|
|
Plaintiff
FILBERT TANDE
1633 Berry Dr.
Pittsburgh, PA 15227 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order of Consolidation (Docket on Member Case Only)
Wed 04/24 5:09 PM
ORDER Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Doc.1 ) filed at Civil Action No. 24-571 is GRANTED. Additionally, Plaintiff's second and third filed cases at Civil Action Nos. 24-572 and 24-573 shall be consolidated under Lead Case No. 24-571. All pleadings, motions and other papers related to 24-572 and 24-573 shall be filed at the Lead Case 24-571. Moreover, Civil Action Nos. 24-572 and 24-573 are dismissed without prejudice and will be administratively closed. Finally, Plaintiff shall file one Amended Complaint encompassing all of his claims, against all defendants, from all three cases, including any relevant exhibits, no later than 5/28/24. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/24/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tgl) Modified text on 4/24/2024. (tgl) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option
Wed 04/17 2:00 PM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by FILBERT TANDE. (sdp) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/17 1:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by FILBERT TANDE. (sdp) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 04/17 1:40 PM
Judge Cathy Bissoon added. (sdp) |