White v. Houchens Food Group, Inc. et al
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Kelly F Pate |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00228 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court of Geneva County, AL, 24-cv-24-900024.00 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 2:10 PM CDT |
Defendant
Food Giant Supermarkets, Inc.
2000 Interstate Park Drive - Suite 204
Montgomery, AL 36109 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Houchens Food Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William E. White, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/30 2:14 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by William E. White, Jr re14 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Howell, Theodore) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement
Mon 04/29 4:25 PM
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to William E. White, Jr.; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/9/2024.(BES) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order and Sample Format | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/29 4:11 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William E. White, Jr. (Howell, Theodore) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/25 10:11 AM
ORDER: it is ORDERED that Defendants must correct this deficiency by May9, 2024, as further set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 4/25/2024. (BES) |
|
11 | 11
5
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/25 10:09 AM
ORDER: Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form and send it to the Clerk by May 16, 2024; Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor the reassignment form into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 4/25/2024. (BES) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/17 9:07 AM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Food Giant Supermarkets, Inc. re6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Butler, Michael) Modified on 4/17/2024 to add link(BES) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/17 9:06 AM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Houchens Food Group, Inc. re6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Butler, Michael) Modified on 4/17/2024 to add link (BES) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel
Tue 04/16 1:13 PM
NOTICE to Counsel re Pro Hac Vice admission for Attorney Lance Edward Berry. (BES) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel
Tue 04/16 1:11 PM
NOTICE to Counsel re Pro Hac Vice admission for Attorney J. Brad Prosch. (BES) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement
Tue 04/16 1:06 PM
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Food Giant Supermarkets, Inc. & Houchens Food Group, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/26/2024.(BES) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order and Sample Format | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/16 1:05 PM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (ALL PARTIES) Food Giant Supermarkets, Inc., Houchens Food Group, Inc., William E. White, Jr.. (BES) |
|
4 | 4
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/16 1:02 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate as Presiding Judge. (BES) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss
Tue 04/16 9:52 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Houchens Food Group, Inc.. (Butler, Michael) Modified on 4/16/2024 to clarify text (BES) |
|
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/16 9:47 AM
ANSWER with JURY DEMAND to Complaint by Food Giant Supermarkets, Inc.. (Butler, Michael) Modified on 4/16/2024 to reflect jury demand (BES) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/16 9:44 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Geneva County, AL, case number 24-cv-24-900024.00. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AALMDC-3623518) , filed by Houchens Food Group, Inc., Food Giant Supermarkets, Inc.. (Butler, Michael) Modified on 4/16/2024 to correct text (BES). (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/16/2024) (BES). (BES) |
|
Att: 1 (4/16/2024) Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 (4/16/2024) Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 (4/16/2024) Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 (4/16/2024) Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 (4/16/2024) Exhibit 4 | ||
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 12:04 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Food Giant Supermarkets, Inc., Houchens Food Group, Inc., filed by William E. White, Jr.. (no PDF attached to this entry - see doc 1 -3 at page 8 for PDF)(BES) |