Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Gary A Fenner
Case #: 4:24-cv-00271
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2024
Terminated:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 13, 2024 4:14 AM CDT
Defendant
Restoration Hardware, Inc.
Represented By
Stacy M Bunck
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart-Kcmo
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Honnes
Represented By
Brad K. Thoenen
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
Ethan Alexander Crockett
Hkm Employment Attorneys, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
31 31 order Order of Dismissal Tue 11/26 10:20 AM
Order of Dismissal. Signed on 11/26/24 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 11/26 9:10 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal (Joint) by Richard Honnes. (Crockett, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
29 29 order Order Tue 11/12 9:29 AM
ORDER directing the parties to file their JOINT stipulation of dismissal or Status Report by 1/11/2025. Signed on 11/12/24 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
28 28 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 10/03 2:50 PM
Amended NOTICE to take deposition of Jovy Cabaltera filed by Ethan Alexander Crockett on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Honnes.(Crockett, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
27 27 discov Notice to Take Deposition Wed 10/02 2:31 PM
Amended NOTICE to take deposition of Jovy Cabaltera filed by Ethan Alexander Crockett on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Honnes.(Crockett, Ethan)
Related: [-]
26 26 discov Notice to Take Deposition Wed 10/02 2:30 PM
NOTICE to take deposition of Casey Scott filed by Ethan Alexander Crockett on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Honnes.(Crockett, Ethan)
Related: [-]
25 25 discov Notice to Take Deposition Wed 10/02 2:29 PM
NOTICE to take deposition of Nick Astle filed by Ethan Alexander Crockett on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Honnes.(Crockett, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
24 24 discov Certificate of Service Mon 09/23 4:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard Honnes (Plaintiffs Responses and Objections to Defendants Second Request for Production of Documents) filed by Ethan Alexander Crockett on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Honnes.(Crockett, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
23 23 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 09/12 3:22 PM
NOTICE to take deposition of Jovy Cabaltera filed by Ethan Alexander Crockett on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Honnes.(Crockett, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
22 22 discov Certificate of Service Thu 08/22 12:09 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Restoration Hardware, Inc. of Second Request for Production of Documents filed by Stacy M Bunck on behalf of Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc..(Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
21 21 discov Notice to Take Deposition Tue 08/13 10:06 AM
Amended NOTICE to take deposition of Richard Honnes filed by Stacy M Bunck on behalf of Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc..(Bunck, Stacy) (Main Document 21 replaced at the request of counsel due to typographical error on 8/13/2024 - NEF Regenerated) (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
20 20 discov Certificate of Service Mon 07/22 9:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard Honnes Answers to Defendants First Interrogatories and Responses to Defendants First Request for Production of Documents filed by Ethan Alexander Crockett on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Honnes.(Crockett, Ethan)
Related: [-]
19 19 discov Certificate of Service Mon 07/22 6:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Restoration Hardware, Inc. Re Defendant's Answers to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents filed by Stacy M Bunck on behalf of Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc..(Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
18 18 discov Notice to Take Deposition Wed 07/17 2:23 PM
NOTICE to take deposition of Frank Mahaffay filed by Ethan Alexander Crockett on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Honnes.(Crockett, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
17 17 discov Notice to Take Deposition Fri 07/05 4:33 PM
NOTICE to take deposition of Richard Honnes filed by Stacy M Bunck on behalf of Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc..(Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/25 11:08 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/13/2024. Pretrial Conference via telephone set for 7/17/2025 01:30 PM before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Jury Trial set for 8/19/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8A, Kansas City (GAF) before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2025. Signed on 6/25/24 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Rules of trial Tue 06/25 11:05 AM
RULES OF TRIAL Signed on 6/25/24 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
14 14 discov Certificate of Service Mon 06/24 5:06 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Restoration Hardware, Inc. Re Defendant's Rule 26 (a)(1) Disclosures filed by Stacy M Bunck on behalf of Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc..(Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
13 13 discov Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures Mon 06/24 4:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Ethan Alexander Crockett on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Honnes.(Crockett, Ethan)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 06/24 4:09 PM
Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Richard Honnes. (Crockett, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
11 11 discov Certificate of Service Fri 06/07 2:00 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard Honnes Plaintiff's 1st Interrogatories and RFP filed by Ethan Alexander Crockett on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Honnes.(Crockett, Ethan)
Related: [-]
10 10 discov Certificate of Service Fri 06/07 10:43 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Restoration Hardware, Inc. Re Defendant's First Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff filed by Stacy M Bunck on behalf of Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc..(Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
9 9 order Protective Order Tue 06/04 1:58 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed on 6/4/24 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
8 8 motion Protective Order Mon 06/03 2:22 PM
Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Stacy M Bunck on behalf of Restoration Hardware, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/17/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
adr Designation of Mediator Thu 05/23 1:09 PM
Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (Melvin, Greg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
7 7 adr Designation of Mediator Tue 05/21 8:11 AM
DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming David C. Vogel(Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
6 6 discov Disclosure of corporate interests Wed 05/08 12:48 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Stacy M Bunck on behalf of Defendant Restoration Hardware, Inc..(Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Rule 16 Notice Wed 05/08 10:15 AM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/22/2024. Rule 26 conference due by 6/12/2024. Signed on 5/8/24 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/08 10:02 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint on behalf of Restoration Hardware, Inc..(Attorney Stacy M Bunck added to party Restoration Hardware, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bunck, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
3 3 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Thu 04/25 12:54 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Richard Honnes. Restoration Hardware, Inc. served on 4/18/2024, answer due 5/9/2024. (Crockett, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of MAPN Tue 04/16 2:55 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/16 2:04 PM
COMPLAINT against Restoration Hardware, Inc. filed by Ethan Alexander Crockett on behalf of Richard Honnes. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-8963612. Service due by 7/15/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Crockett, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Ex. A - Civil Cover Sheet
service Summons Issued Tue 04/16 2:59 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Restoration Hardware, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]