Bowers v. Zurple, Inc. et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando J Gaitan, Jr |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00272 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 2:12 PM CDT |
Defendant
Sharon G Aubuchon
|
|
Defendant
Zurple, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Eric Bowers
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 04/24 4:01 PM
Order of Dismissal with prejudice - GRANTING4 plaintiff's MOTION to dismiss as to defendant Zurple. Signed on 4/24/24 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Anderson, Christy) Modified on 4/24/2024 (Anderson, Christy) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss Party
Wed 04/24 9:09 AM
MOTION to dismiss party with Prejudice as to Sharon G. Aubuchon d/b/a Kansas City Property Search filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/8/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Voytas, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 4:30 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sharon G Aubuchon, Zurple, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Filing
Tue 04/16 2:45 PM
NOTICE of filing AO 121 on behalf of plaintiff. Copy of report mailed to Register of Copyrights U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E. Washington, D.C. 20559-6000 (Woods, Gloria) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of MAPN
Tue 04/16 2:41 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Woods, Gloria) |
|
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
1 | 1
13
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 1:34 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-8963448. Service due by 7/15/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Voytas, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |