Russell v. Le
Nebraska District Court | |
Judge: | Robert F Rossiter, Jr |
Referred: | Michael D Nelson |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00134 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 2:11 PM CDT |
Petitioner
Sonia Russell
Office of Secretary of State, Address Confidentiality Prog. State Capitol Building 1445 K St. Ste. 2300
Lincoln, NE 68509 |
|
Respondent
Hung Le
7912 Reed St.
Papillion, NE 68046 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading
Wed 04/17 1:36 PM
TEXT ORDER granting3 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. For good cause shown, the respondent shall have an extension of time to June 14, 2024, to file an answer or other responsive pleading. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN) |
|
5 | 5
oth_evt
Assignment of Judges
Wed 04/17 9:36 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/16 1:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Co-Counsel by Attorney Timothy R. Hook on behalf of Respondent Hung Le (Hook, Timothy) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading
Tue 04/16 12:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Eric W. Synowicki on behalf of Respondent Hung Le.(Synowicki, Eric) |
|
2 | 2
oth_doc
Declaration
Tue 04/16 12:39 PM
DECLARATION as to Filing Notice of Removal by Attorney Eric W. Synowicki on behalf of Respondent Hung Le.(Synowicki, Eric) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/16 12:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL of State Court Action against Hung Le from District Court of Douglas County, Case number CI 24-2650 with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Eric W. Synowicki on behalf of Hung Le(Synowicki, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Docs |