Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Joe Heaton
Case #: 5:24-cv-00390
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:145 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2024
Terminated:Jul 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 13, 2024 4:09 AM CDT
Defendant
RigRooster LLC
Plaintiff
iBall Instruments LLC
Represented By
Littleton Tazewell Ellett, IV
Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, P.C.
contact info
Daniel V Carsey
Hall Estill-Okc
contact info


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Friday, July 26, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 07/26 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by iBall Instruments LLC (Ellett, Littleton)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
9 9 order Administrative Closing Order Fri 07/12 4:35 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 30 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 07/12/2024. (lam)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 07/12 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by iBall Instruments LLC (Carsey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Wed 04/24 3:20 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by iBall Instruments LLC . (Carsey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Entry of Appearance Wed 04/24 3:05 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Littleton Tazewell Ellett, IV on behalf of iBall Instruments LLC (Ellett, Littleton)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Entry of Appearance Wed 04/24 3:04 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel V Carsey on behalf of iBall Instruments LLC (Carsey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order for Response Wed 04/24 2:43 PM
ENTER ORDER directing counsel for plaintiff to file an entry of appearance not later than 04/25/2024. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 04/24/2023. (lam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
3 3 1 pgs notice ~Notice (other) Tue 04/16 1:35 PM
NOTICE: AO 120 form mailed to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office P.O. Box 1450 Alexandria, VA 22313(naa)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 04/16 1:33 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to RigRooster LLC. (naa)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/16 1:32 PM
COMPLAINT against RigRooster LLC filed by iBall Instruments LLC.(naa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Patent,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Payment for a Civil Case Tue 04/16 3:48 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4411030. (Carsey, Daniel)
Related: [-]