MICHAEL et al v. ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Nora Barry Fischer |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00576 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 3:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LEILANI MICHAEL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KEVIN REIGH
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Mon 04/29 4:42 PM
BRIEF in Support re6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Maczuzak, Tara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/29 4:41 PM
ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions. Details more fully stated in Order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 4/29/2024. (lyk) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/29 4:40 PM
ORDER RE: Motions Practice. Details more fully stated in Order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 4/29/2024. (lyk) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 04/29 4:40 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Maczuzak, Tara) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice of ADR Designation
Mon 04/29 4:40 PM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (lyk) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/22 3:38 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY Answer due from ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY on 4/29/2024. (Maczuzak, Tara) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 04/17 9:23 AM
Judge Nora Barry Fischer added. (jkn) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))
Tue 04/16 4:52 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying Allstate Insurance Company; Allstate Holdings, LLC; The Allstate Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Maczuzak, Tara) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))
Tue 04/16 4:46 PM
Disclosure Statement, declaring citizenship by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Maczuzak, Tara) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Notice of Removal (Credit Card Required)
Tue 04/16 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County Court of Common Pleas, case number GD-24-002958. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number BPAWDC-8219131), filed by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Maczuzak, Tara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |