JANKOWSKI v. STUVER et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Bissoon |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00578 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 3:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
ALEXIS STUVER
2150 N. BAYSHORE AVE. APT. 612
MIAMI, FL 33137 |
|
Defendant
DOUGLAS STUVER
99 BURRWOOD CMN.
FAIRFIELD, CT 06824 |
|
Plaintiff
AMANDA JANKOWSKI
2484 WENDE RD.
ALDEN, NY 14004 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 1:12 PM
Summons Issued as to ALEXIS STUVER, DOUGLAS STUVER (cel) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
3 | 3
service
Praecipe to Issue Summons
Fri 04/19 8:58 AM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by AMANDA JANKOWSKI (Nese, Amanda) Modified text on 4/19/2024. (cel) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/17 4:07 PM
ORDER governing procedures for motions filed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. See contents of this filing for instructions. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/17/2024. (jmm) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 04/17 3:45 PM
Judge Cathy Bissoon added. (cel) |
||
misc
QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply)
Wed 04/17 3:58 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Attorney is advised that the s/ signature on the disclosure statement is not formatted correctly. Attorney is advised to use the Disclosure Statement event to refile the disclosure statement separately with a corrected signature line. CORRECTION: This message is for informational purposes only. (cel) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required)
Tue 04/16 2:57 PM
COMPLAINT against ALEXIS STUVER, DOUGLAS STUVER (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8219212), filed by AMANDA JANKOWSKI. (Nese, Amanda) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, | ||
Att: 2 Docket Sheet DISCLOSURE STATEMENT |