Evans v. Shellabarger
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Michael E Hegarty |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01010 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 2:10 PM MDT |
Defendant
Connor Shellabarger
6530 Coldwater Dr
Parker, CO 80134 |
|
Plaintiff
Wanda Y Evans
1036 South Mackon Street
Aurora, CO 80012 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Minute Order
Wed 04/17 1:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Magistrate Consent Form due 6/4/2024 . Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/4/2024 . Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2024 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/17/2024. (dgumb, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 2:43 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (bcroc, ) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 04/16 2:21 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (bcroc, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2
Tue 04/16 1:46 PM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re:1 Complaint, filed by attorney Clarence Gamble. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix a complete signature block to all future documents. (Text Only Entry) (bcroc, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 1:08 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Connor Shellabarger (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9639929)Attorney Clarence Edwin Gamble added to party Wanda Y Evans(pty:pla), filed by Wanda Y Evans.(Gamble, Clarence) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |