Khan v. Commissioner of Social Secuity
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Robert E Blackburn |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01011 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/19 7:48 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration All parties consent.. (Verdis, Michelle) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/18 10:39 AM
Order Granting2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/18/2024.(angar, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Wed 04/17 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michelle C. Verdis on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney Michelle C. Verdis added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Verdis, Michelle) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Administrative Notice
Wed 04/17 9:31 AM
Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court; U.S. Attorney's Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (ykare, ) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Wed 04/17 9:29 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (ykare, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Wed 04/17 9:25 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (ykare, ) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/16 1:37 PM
Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Michael Khan. (Konoski, Bryan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 1:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Michael Khan Attorney Bryan Matthew Konoski added to party Michael Khan(pty:pla), filed by Michael Khan.(Konoski, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |