W.W. Norton & Company, Inc. v. Follett Higher Education Group, LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lewis J Liman |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02879 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 4:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Follett Higher Education Group, LLC
3 Westbrook Corporate Center Suite 200
Westchester, IL 60154 |
|
Defendant
George Kyroudis
7936 Palm Ct
Orland Park, IL 60462 |
|
Defendant
Ryan Peterson
|
|
Plaintiff
W.W. Norton & Company, Inc.
500 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10110 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Fri 04/26 11:26 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Service was accepted by Debbie Smolicek. Document filed by W.W. Norton & Company, Inc...(Franklin, Olivia) |
|
16 | 16
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Fri 04/26 11:22 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Service was accepted by Debbie Smolicek, Facilities Specialist. Document filed by W.W. Norton & Company, Inc...(Franklin, Olivia) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Thu 04/25 5:36 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Ryan Peterson served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024. Service was accepted by Debbie Smolicek. Document filed by W.W. Norton & Company, Inc...(Franklin, Olivia) |
|
14 | 14
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Thu 04/25 5:33 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. George Kyroudis served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024. Service was accepted by Debbie Smolicek. Document filed by W.W. Norton & Company, Inc...(Franklin, Olivia) |
|
13 | 13
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Thu 04/25 5:02 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Follett Higher Education Group, LLC served on 4/23/2024, answer due 5/14/2024. Service was accepted by Debbie Smolicek, Facilities Specialist. Document filed by W.W. Norton & Company, Inc...(Franklin, Olivia) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 2:53 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ryan Peterson. (sj) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 2:49 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to George Kyroudis. (sj) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 2:46 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Follett Higher Education Group, LLC. (sj) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/18 11:39 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ryan Peterson, re:6 Complaint. Document filed by W.W. Norton & Company, Inc...(Koonce, Lacy) |
|
8 | 8
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/18 11:38 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to George Kyroudis, re:6 Complaint. Document filed by W.W. Norton & Company, Inc...(Koonce, Lacy) |
|
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/18 11:37 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Follett Higher Education Group, LLC, re:6 Complaint. Document filed by W.W. Norton & Company, Inc...(Koonce, Lacy) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 12:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Follett Higher Education Group, LLC, George Kyroudis, Ryan Peterson. Document filed by W.W. Norton & Company, Inc...(Koonce, Lacy) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Wed 04/17 11:50 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lacy Herman Koonce, III to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Wed 04/17 11:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lacy Herman Koonce, III. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $8,337,127,000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $8,337,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/17 11:52 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/17 11:54 AM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/17 11:54 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/16 4:44 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Olivia Franklin on behalf of W.W. Norton & Company, Inc...(Franklin, Olivia) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/16 4:18 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lacy Herman Koonce, III on behalf of W.W. Norton & Company, Inc...(Koonce, Lacy) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/16 3:49 PM
FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by W.W. Norton & Company, Inc...(Koonce, Lacy) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/16 3:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Koonce, Lacy) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29226692)Document filed by W.W. Norton & Company, Inc...(Franklin, Olivia) |