Newton v. LVNV Funding, LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Kathryn Kimball Mizelle |
Referred: | Christopher P Tuite |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00925 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | County Court of Hillsborough, 24-CC-015729 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 5:14 PM EDT |
Defendant
LVNV Funding LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Resurgent Capital Services, LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Newton
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/24 6:24 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by LVNV Funding, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sherman Originator, LLC for LVNV Funding, LLC. (Marees, II, John) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/24 6:24 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Resurgent Capital Services L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Resurgent Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Alegis Group, LLC for Resurgent Capital Services L.P. (Marees, II, John) Modified docket text on 4/24/2024 (SET) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Wed 04/24 6:23 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services L.P.. Related case(s): No (Marees, II, John) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Wed 04/24 6:22 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by John Michael Marees, II on behalf of LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services L.P.. Lead Counsel: John M. Marees, II. (Marees, II, John) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/24 6:21 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services L.P..(Marees, II, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 04/23 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re:7 Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for Consideration of the Inexpensive Determination, Efficient, and Abbreviated Litigation (IDEAL) Program (IDEAL Referral Order). For the reasons set forth in the IDEAL Referral Order, a case management conference is set for May 16, 2024, at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite via Zoom videoconference. The parties should review the IDEAL Referral Order in advance of the hearing and be prepared to discuss any procedures that they believe could streamline discovery, motions practice, and trial. All pertinent parties will receive a Zoom videoconference invitation by separate email. Each person who participates in the proceeding must attend using his or her own device so that he or she appears on a separate screen during the videoconference. (MEL) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Hearing / Conference
Tue 04/23 10:52 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting the parties' 8 Joint Motion to Schedule Case Management Conference. The Court will set a case management conference by separate notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 4/23/2024. (MEL) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Hearing / Conference
Mon 04/22 10:52 AM
Joint MOTION for Case Management Conference re7 Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program by Edward Newton. (Cok, Christian) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program
Fri 04/19 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (AMS) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Wed 04/17 3:34 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Edward Newton. Related case(s): No (Cok, Christian) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/17 3:29 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Edward Newton. (Cok, Christian) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Wed 04/17 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christian Earl Cok on behalf of Edward Newton. Lead Counsel: Christian E. Cok. (Cok, Christian) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 04/17 1:15 PM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ELM) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/17 11:37 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:24-cv-925-KKM-CPT. (AA) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/16 3:40 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough County Court, case number 24-CC-015729 filed in State Court on 03/21/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21989338 filed by LVNV Funding LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, LP.(Marees, II, John) |
|
Att: 1 18 pgs State Court COMPLAINT, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |