Robinson v. United States of America
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy W Berger |
Referred: | Daniel C Irick |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00714 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Wed 05/01 4:11 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/1/2024. (RMF) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in support
Tue 04/23 10:12 AM
MEMORANDUM in support re1 Motion to Vacate / Set Aside / Correct Sentence (2255),2 Order filed by Jesse Bernard Robinson, Jr. (Rosenbaum, Richard) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/22 4:23 PM
ORDER. Petitioner shall refile the Memorandum by converting it to PDF directlyfrom the word processing application or provide good cause as to why this cannotbe done. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 4/22/2024. (TNP) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion to Vacate / Set Aside / Correct Sentence (2255)
Tue 04/16 2:04 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Jesse Bernard Robinson, Jr.(Rosenbaum, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |