MULLEN v. Wentworth-Douglass Hospital et al
New Hampshire District Court | |
Judge: | Andrea K Johnstone |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00104 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Strafford County Superior Court, 219-2024-CV-00178 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 5:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
Mass General Brigham Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wentworth-Douglass Hospital
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JESSE MULLEN
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 5:03 PM
Assented to MOTION for Michael Steinberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2502795.) filed by Mass General Brigham Incorporated, Wentworth-Douglass Hospital.(Massey, Hillary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Michael Steinberg | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 5:00 PM
Assented to MOTION for Kristin G. McGurn to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2502794.) filed by Mass General Brigham Incorporated, Wentworth-Douglass Hospital.(Massey, Hillary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Kristin G. McGurn | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 4:57 PM
Assented to MOTION for Dawn R. Solowey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2502793.) filed by Mass General Brigham Incorporated, Wentworth-Douglass Hospital.(Massey, Hillary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Dawn R. Solowey | ||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
State Court Record
Tue 04/23 10:18 AM
Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 219-2024-CV-00178, Strafford County Superior Court(Massey, Hillary) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extend Time to Answer
Fri 04/19 10:38 AM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to May 17, 2024 filed by Mass General Brigham Incorporated, Wentworth-Douglass Hospital.(Massey, Hillary) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer
Fri 04/19 2:01 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 6 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to May 17, 2024 . Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 5/17/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(kad) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Magistrate Judge Assignment
Wed 04/17 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties. MJ Consent Form Due 6/6/2024.(ed) |
|
notice
Notice - ECF
Wed 04/17 3:54 PM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website[LINK:HERE] .(ed) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/16 3:21 PM
Disclosure Statement by Wentworth-Douglass Hospital disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Massey, Hillary) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/16 3:17 PM
Disclosure Statement by Mass General Brigham Incorporated disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Massey, Hillary) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Attorney Appearance
Tue 04/16 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hillary Massey on behalf of Mass General Brigham Incorporated, Wentworth-Douglass Hospital (Massey, Hillary) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal - New Case
Tue 04/16 3:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Strafford County Superior Court, case number 219-2024-CV-00178 (filing fee $405, receipt number ANHDC-2499845) filed by Mass General Brigham Incorporated, Wentworth-Douglass Hospital. Answer Follow Up on 5/7/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 4/30/2024.(Massey, Hillary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Wed 04/17 3:52 PM
Case assigned to US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:24-cv-104-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed) |