Hernandes et al v. Lo Sewing, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Laura Taylor Swain |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02883 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 5:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Maria Gallegos
|
|
Defendant
Selin LNU
|
|
Defendant
Lo Sewing, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Rufina Hernandes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reyna Meza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Zumba Quinde
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Reyes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Gabriel Sangurima
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Amended Civil Case Administrative Closing Order
Tue 04/23 8:31 AM
AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 6/24/2024. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on January 14, 2021) (vf) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/23 8:29 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/23 8:29 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Memo Endorsement
Wed 04/17 6:36 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:4 Letter filed by Jose Gabriel Sangurima, Rufina Hernandes, Maria Reyes, Maria Zumba Quinde, Reyna Meza. ENDORSEMENT: The foregoing request is granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to return the $405.00 filing fee to Plaintiffs' counsel and close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/17/2024) (vfr) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Wed 04/17 4:48 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Michael Taubenfeld, Esq. dated 4/17/2024 re: Erroneous Filing. Document filed by Rufina Hernandes, Reyna Meza, Maria Zumba Quinde, Maria Reyes, Jose Gabriel Sangurima..(Taubenfeld, Michael) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Wed 04/17 9:14 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Taubenfeld. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jose Gabriel Sangurima, Reyna Meza, Rufina Hernandes, Maria Reyes, Maria Zumba Quinde. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/17 9:14 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Michael Taubenfeld to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Wed 04/17 9:17 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael Taubenfeld to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; The Filing Court title on PDF reflects "Eastern District of New York; The pleading title is not provided on PDF. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 4/22/2024. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/17 9:26 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Taubenfeld to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form; Filing Court and Clerk of Court Error; The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/16 5:00 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LO SEWING, INC., MARIA GALLEGOS, and SELIN LNU, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Rufina Hernandes, Reyna Meza, Maria Zumba Quinde, Maria Reyes, Jose Gabriel Sangurima..(Taubenfeld, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/16 4:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Taubenfeld, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
17
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 4:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Maria Gallegos, Selin LNU, Lo Sewing, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29227594)Document filed by Jose Gabriel Sangurima, Reyna Meza, Rufina Hernandes, Maria Reyes, Maria Zumba Quinde..(Taubenfeld, Michael) |