Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Patricia A Gaughan
Case #: 1:24-cv-00686
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2024
Terminated:Oct 25, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 14, 2024 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Bedford City Board of Education
475 Northfield Road
Bedford, OH 44146
Represented By
Maria Fair
Weston Hurd
contact info
Hannah Markel Klang
Weston Hurd
contact info
Defendant
Bedford City School District
475 Northfield Road
Bedford, OH 44146
Represented By
Maria Fair
Weston Hurd
contact info
Hannah Markel Klang
Weston Hurd
contact info
Defendant
Bridgett Ewing
39 Gould Avenue
Bedford, OH 44146
Represented By
Maria Fair
Weston Hurd
contact info
Hannah Markel Klang
Weston Hurd
contact info
Defendant
Principal Alvin Cory McDaniel
Carlywood Intermediate School 240 Marion Drive
Bedford, OH 44146
Represented By
Maria Fair
Weston Hurd
contact info
Hannah Markel Klang
Weston Hurd
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Speight
1140 Clifford Road
Cleveland, OH 44121
Represented By
Maria Fair
Weston Hurd
contact info
Hannah Markel Klang
Weston Hurd
contact info
Defendant
Ronald Yarbough
18851 Abby Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44119
Represented By
Maria Fair
Weston Hurd
contact info
Hannah Markel Klang
Weston Hurd
contact info
Defendant
John Does
Defendant
John Doe Corporations
Defendant
Superintendent Cassandra Johnson
Bedford City School District 5308 Yosemite Drive
Medina, OH 44256
Represented By
Maria Fair
Weston Hurd
contact info
Hannah Markel Klang
Weston Hurd
contact info
Defendant
Diane Smith
6012 Lehman Drive
Bedford, OH 44146
Represented By
Maria Fair
Weston Hurd
contact info
Hannah Markel Klang
Weston Hurd
contact info
Plaintiff
Lanese Bliss
Represented By
Dayna M. Hloska
Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland
contact info
Kristina Walter Supler
Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland
contact info
Susan C. Stone
Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland
contact info
Anna Elaine Bullock
Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, October 25, 2024
22 22 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Order Dismissing Case Fri 10/25 9:10 AM
Marginal Entry Order : Before the Court is a Stipulated Notice of Dismissal. It is so ordered. District Judge Patricia A Gaughan on 10/25/24. (LC,S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 10/24 12:33 PM
Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Bedford City School District. (Fair, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
order Minute Order _ Status Conference Wed 10/16 4:13 PM
Minutes/Order [non-document]: Status Conference was held. The Court now expects a dismissal entry on or before November 15, 2024. District Judge Patricia A Gaughan on 10/16/24. (LC,S)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to stay Wed 10/16 4:16 PM
Order [non-document]: Joint Motion to Extend Stay is granted. District Judge Patricia A Gaughan on 10/16/24. (LC,S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
20 20 motion Stay Tue 10/15 3:34 PM
Joint Motion to stay Joint Motion to Extend Stay filed by Plaintiff Lanese Bliss. Related document(s)19 ,. (Supler, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
19 19 motion Stay Mon 07/22 11:26 AM
Joint Motion to stay filed by Defendant Bedford City School District. (Fair, Maria)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to stay Mon 07/22 2:12 PM
Order [non-document]: Parties' Joint Motion to Stay is granted. The Court expects a dismissal entry by October 14, 2024. District Judge Patricia A Gaughan on 7/22/24. (LC,S) Related [+]
Related: [-] 19
Friday, June 28, 2024
18 18 motion Dismiss Fri 06/28 4:09 PM
Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Bedford City Board of Education, Bedford City School District, Bridgett Ewing, Cassandra Johnson, Alvin Cory McDaniel, Diane Smith, Jennifer Speight, Ronald Yarbough. Related document(s)1 . (Klang, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
17 17 order Minute Order _ Case Management Conference Wed 06/26 12:22 PM
Case Management Order : Case Management Conference was held on 6/26/24. Case is assigned to the standard track. Case is suitable now for Mediation. The parties will engage in Private Mediation. Non-expert discovery shall be completed on or before 11/14/24. Expert reports shall be exchanged on or before 12/14/24 for party with burden of proof & 1/14/25 for Rebuttal and Expert Discovery shall be completed on or before 2/14/25. Pleadings shall be amended without leave of Court and new parties shall be joined on or before 10/1/24. Dispositive Motions shall be filed on or before 3/14/25. Telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/16/24 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will initiate the call with attorneys only. However, the parties must be available for immediate contact, if necessary. Counsel shall confer to discuss outstanding issues and respective positions as to settlement. Counsel shall provide to the Court within three business days prior to the status conference a joint status report or individual status reports describing discovery, settlement positions, and issues to be addressed. The status report(s) need not be filed, but may be delivered via e-mail at Gaughan_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov. Individual status reports must be exchanged with opposing counsel. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/26/24. (LC,S)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Wed 06/26 11:14 AM
Attorney Appearance by Dayna M. Hloska filed by on behalf of Lanese Bliss. (Hloska, Dayna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
15 15 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 06/19 8:51 AM
Defendants' Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures filed by Bedford City Board of Education. (Fair, Maria)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
14 14 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Fri 06/14 1:31 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Lanese Bliss. (Supler, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/03 2:22 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lanese Bliss. Cassandra Johnson waiver sent on 4/30/2024, answer due 7/1/2024 filed on behalf of Lanese Bliss (Stone, Susan)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/03 2:21 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lanese Bliss. Ronald Yarbough waiver sent on 4/30/2024, answer due 7/1/2024 filed on behalf of Lanese Bliss (Stone, Susan)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/03 2:20 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lanese Bliss. Jennifer Speight waiver sent on 4/30/2024, answer due 7/1/2024 filed on behalf of Lanese Bliss (Stone, Susan)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/03 2:19 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lanese Bliss. Diane Smith waiver sent on 4/30/2024, answer due 7/1/2024 filed on behalf of Lanese Bliss (Stone, Susan)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/03 2:18 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lanese Bliss. Bridgett Ewing waiver sent on 4/30/2024, answer due 7/1/2024 filed on behalf of Lanese Bliss (Stone, Susan)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/03 2:17 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lanese Bliss. Bedford City Board of Education waiver sent on 4/30/2024, answer due 7/1/2024 filed on behalf of Lanese Bliss (Stone, Susan)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/03 2:16 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lanese Bliss. Bedford City School District waiver sent on 4/30/2024, answer due 7/1/2024 filed on behalf of Lanese Bliss (Stone, Susan)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/03 2:13 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lanese Bliss. Alvin Cory McDaniel waiver sent on 4/30/2024, answer due 7/1/2024 filed on behalf of Lanese Bliss (Stone, Susan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney Fri 05/03 11:14 AM
Order [non-document]: Attorney Dayna M. Hloska's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for plaintiff is granted. District Judge Patricia A Gaughan on 5/3/24. (LC,S) Related [+]
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, May 02, 2024
5 5 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 05/02 4:11 PM
Motion by Dayna M. Hloska to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff Lanese Bliss.(Stone, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
4 4 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Wed 05/01 11:27 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 6/26/2024 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A Gaughan. Signed District Judge Patricia A Gaughan on 5/01/24. (D,Ma)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
3 3 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Fri 04/26 3:48 PM
Attorney Appearance for Bedford City School District, Bedford City Board of Education, Bridgett Ewing, Alvin Cory McDaniel, Cassandra Johnson, Diane Smith, Ronald Yarbough, and Jennifer Speight by Maria Fair and Hannah Markel Klang filed by on behalf of Bedford City Board of Education. (Fair, Maria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
oth_evt Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Thu 04/18 3:10 PM
Notice to Attorney Dayna M. Hloska. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Wed 04/17 10:31 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Bridgett Ewing, Cassandra Johnson, Alvin Cory McDaniel, Diane Smith, Jennifer Speight, and Ronald Yarbough. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
utility Add and Terminate Judge Wed 04/17 9:51 AM
Judge Patricia A Gaughan assigned to case. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Wed 04/17 10:06 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/16 4:24 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Bedford City Board of Education, Bedford City School District, Bridgett Ewing, Cassandra Johnson, Alvin Cory McDaniel, Diane Smith, Jennifer Speight, Ronald Yarbough. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12512258.. Filed by Lanese Bliss. (Stone, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Anti-Harassment Policy Manual,
Att: 3 Exhibit Policy,
Att: 4 Exhibit Student Discipline,
Att: 5 Exhibit Non Discrimination Policy,
Att: 6 Exhibit Anti-Harassment Policy,
Att: 7 Exhibit Student Parent Handbook,
Att: 8 Exhibit Student Records Policy,
Att: 9 Summons Alvin Cory McDaniel,
Att: 10 Summons Bridgett Ewing,
Att: 11 Summons Cassandra Johnson,
Att: 12 Summons Diane Smith,
Att: 13 Summons Jennifer Speight,
Att: 14 Summons Ronald Yarbough