Gura et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael H Watson |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01790 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 5:18 PM EDT |
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
1 State Farm Plaza
Bloomington, IL 61710 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward T. Gura
58910 Glenns Run Road
Martins Ferry, OH 43935 |
|
Plaintiff
Mary E Gura
58910 Glenns Run Road
Martins Ferry, OH 43935 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 04/30 11:18 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Norris, Melanie) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/29 10:45 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to Edward T. Gura and Mary E Gura's 3 Complaint by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Norris, Melanie) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 04/17 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2024 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 9:07 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed in Belmont County Court of Common Pleas on 3/14/2024, case 24CV066 by Edward T. Gura, Mary E Gura against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (mas) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/16 4:10 PM
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER to Complaint of Edward T. Gura and Mary E Gura filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Norris, Melanie) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/16 3:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS BELMONT COUNTY, ST. CLAIRSVILLE, OHIO, case number 24-C-0066 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9922430), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Norris, Melanie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Complaint and Docket, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet |