Roberts v. Image Recovery Service, Inc. et al
Illinois Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark A Beatty |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01119 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 5:08 PM CDT |
Defendant
Bridgecrest Acceptance Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Image Recovery Service, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/26 8:07 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Roberts. Image Recovery Service, Inc. served on 4/19/2024, answer due 5/10/2024. (Zelman, Yitzchak) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/24 8:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Roberts. Bridgecrest Acceptance Corporation served on 4/19/2024, answer due 5/10/2024. (Zelman, Yitzchak) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/17 2:56 PM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Ashley Roberts. (Zelman, Yitzchak) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Action
Wed 04/17 12:02 PM
NOTICE OF ACTION re1 Complaint, filed by Ashley Roberts. Because the required Disclosure Statement was not filed with the attached, this matter is being submitted to the presiding judge for further action. A copy of this Court's form Disclosure Statement can be found at[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/forms-0] . (jle) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 10:50 AM
Summonses Issued as to Bridgecrest Acceptance Corporation, Image Recovery Service, Inc and originals mailed to Attorney Zelman. (kdw) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Initial Magistrate Assignment
Wed 04/17 7:59 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Orders 347 and 367. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or non-consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Ashley Roberts. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . All future documents must bear case number 24-cv-1119-MAB. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 5/8/2024. (jle) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/16 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Yitzchak Zelman on behalf of Ashley Roberts (Zelman, Yitzchak) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 3:04 PM
COMPLAINT against Bridgecrest Acceptance Corporation, Image Recovery Service, Inc., filed by Ashley Roberts.(Zelman, Yitzchak) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |