Knoche v. Droege
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | John W Broomes |
Referred: | Teresa J James |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02150 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 5:11 PM CDT |
Defendant
Charles James Droege
|
|
Plaintiff
Steven Knoche
31311 Oak Grove Rd.
Paola, KS 66071 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Supplement
Tue 04/30 1:33 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT to7 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Steven Knoche. (msb) |
|
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/30 1:31 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Charles James Droege filed by Steven Knoche.(msb) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/26 12:47 PM
ORDER granting4 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs ( in forma pauperis ) but WITHHOLDING SERVICE of summons and the Complaint upon Defendant pending further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/26/2024. Mailed to pro se plaintiff Steven Knoche by regular mail. (byk) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Wed 04/17 8:14 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff Matthew Escalante's complaint will not be permitted to be filed in the District of Kansas as he has failed to comply with this court's order on filing restrictions. Escalante has failed to submit a list of all lawsuits pending or previously filed that involve the same or similar claims or parties. This new action involves a defendant that was involved in a prior case. Further, he has also failed to submit a notarized affidavit. Escalante may not circumvent the filing restrictions by including an additional Plaintiff in his complaint. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 4/16/2024. Mailed to pro se party Steven Knoche 31311 Oak Grove Rd. Paola, KS 66071 and Matthew Escalante 733 Hemlock St. Gardner, KS 66061 by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (nac) Modified on 4/17/2024 to add text order was also mailed to Matthew Escalante on 4/17/2024 (nac) |
|
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Wed 04/17 9:10 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nac) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/16 5:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Steven Knoche. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (nac) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Designation of Place of Trial
Tue 04/16 5:00 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Steven Knoche - trial to be held in Kansas City. (nac) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/16 4:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Steven Knoche. (nac) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 4:57 PM
COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Steven Knoche.(nac) |