M.N. et al v. New York City Department of Education et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jesse M Furman |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02887 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 20:1415 IDEA: Challenge decision re education for handicapped |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 6:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
David C. Banks
|
|
Defendant
New York City Department of Education
|
|
Plaintiff
M.N.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
M.N. on behalf of her child N.V., a minor
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Fri 04/19 10:37 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order dated April 18, 2024 served on New York City Department of Education on April 19, 2024. Service was accepted by serviceecf@law.nyc.gov. Service was made by email. Document filed by M.N., M.N. on behalf of her child N.V., a minor..(Roller, Irina) |
|
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Fri 04/19 10:36 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order dated April 18, 2024 served on David C. Banks, in his official capacity as Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education on April 19, 2024. Service was accepted by serviceecf@law.nyc.gov. Service was made by email. Document filed by M.N., M.N. on behalf of her child N.V., a minor..(Roller, Irina) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/18 5:33 PM
ORDER: This case alleges claims under the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act, Title 20, United States Code, Section 1410 et seq. The parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a joint letter, no later than two weeks from the date of this Order and not to exceed two pages, including the following information in separately numbered paragraphs, AS FURTHER SET FORTH IN THIS ORDER. In accordance with the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, requests for an extension or adjournment may be made only by letter-motion filed on ECF and must be received at least 48 hours before the deadline or conference. The written submission must state (1) the original date(s); (2) the number of previous requests for adjournment or extension; (3) whether these previous requests were granted or denied; and (4) whether the adversary consents and, if not, the reasons given by the adversary for refusing to consent. Within two days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall serve the Order electronically on counsel for Defendant and file proof of such service on ECF. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/18/2024) (vfr) |
|
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Thu 04/18 4:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New York City Department of Education served on 4/18/2024, answer due 5/9/2024. Service was accepted by serviceecf@law.nyc.gov. Service was made by email. Document filed by M.N.; M.N. on behalf of her child N.V., a minor..(Roller, Irina) |
|
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Thu 04/18 4:38 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. David C. Banks served on 4/18/2024, answer due 5/9/2024. Service was accepted by serviceecf@law.nyc.gov. Service was made by email. Document filed by M.N.; M.N. on behalf of her child N.V., a minor..(Roller, Irina) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 10:34 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David C. Banks, New York City Department of Education. (vf) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Wed 04/17 10:25 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Irina Roller. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: M.N.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/17 10:28 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/17 10:29 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/17 10:29 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/16 6:02 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education and David C. Banks, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by M.N., M.N. on behalf of her child N.V., a minor..(Roller, Irina) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/16 6:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Roller, Irina) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 5:59 PM
COMPLAINT against David C. Banks, New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29227911)Document filed by M.N., M.N. on behalf of her child N.V., a minor..(Roller, Irina) |