Hofmeister v. Carlin et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Regina M Rodriguez |
Referred: | Maritza Dominguez Braswel |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01019 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Prowers County District Court, 2024CV30002 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 5:09 PM MDT |
Defendant
Cheryl Carlin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Sherill Hofmeister
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
4
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/23 2:20 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/12/2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/23/2024. (evaug) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/23 9:45 AM
ANSWER to4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Cheryl Carlin.(Dagner, Deana) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/17 2:11 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 4/17/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Wed 04/17 9:02 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (efoga, ) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Wed 04/17 9:01 AM
Case assigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 9:00 AM
COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Cheryl Carlin, Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Sherill Hofmeister.(efoga, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases
Wed 04/17 8:59 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Administrative Notice
Wed 04/17 8:58 AM
Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. § 1446(a). Each of the state court documents shall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, ) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/16 4:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cheryl Carlin from Prowers County District Court, Case Number 2024CV30002. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9640800), filed by Cheryl Carlin.(Dagner, Deana) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B - TAR, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex Ex C - Rep Est w.MO Address, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex D - Civil Case Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex E - Plaintiff Filings, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex F - Farmers Filings, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex G - Court Filings |