New Hope Wesleyan Church v. Ecclesia Construction Company, LLC
Nebraska District Court | |
Judge: | Michael D Nelson |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00136 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | North Dakota, 1:23-cv-00105 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 6:08 PM CDT |
Defendant
Ecclesia Construction Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
New Hope Wesleyan Church
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Chief Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Commercial Exterior Specialties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Hite Architecture, P.A.
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Ironhidez Construction, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Shultz Engineering Group, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
Ecclesia Construction Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
73 | 73
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 04/29 12:51 PM
Letter to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Courtney A. Presthus on behalf of Third Party Defendant Shultz Engineering Group, P.C.(TCL) Modified on 4/29/2024 to change event type and description. (TCL) |
|
72 | 72
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 04/29 12:50 PM
Letter to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Thomas E. Kalil on behalf of Plaintiff New Hope Wesleyan Church.(TCL) Modified on 4/29/2024 to change event type and description. (TCL) |
|
71 | 71
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 04/29 12:48 PM
Letter to Withdraw as Attorneys by Attorney C. Todd Koebele and Roland John Wells, III on behalf of Third Party Defendant Commercial Exterior Specialties, LLC.(TCL) Modified on 4/29/2024 to change event type and description. (TCL) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
70 | 70
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 04/26 10:34 AM
TEXT ORDER granting69 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Robert J. Pathroff is granted leave withdraw as counsel for Third-Party Defendant, Chief Industries, Inc. d/b/a Chief Buildings, and shall no longer receive notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
69 | 69
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 04/25 4:20 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Robert J. Pathroff, Vogel Law Firm by Attorney Jennie A. Kuehner on behalf of Third Party Defendant Chief Industries, Inc..(Kuehner, Jennie) |
|
utility
Remark - Public
Thu 04/25 2:57 PM
Remark - Public: Pursuant to the transferring courts order53 that only Ecclesias third-party complaint against Chief Industries was transferred to the District of Nebraska, all other parties were terminated at direction of the court. Only attorney registration deadlines for attorneys representing Ecclesia Construction Company, LLC and Chief Industries, Inc. remain pending. (JLS) |