Putnam County School District v. Alphabet Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 4:22-md-03047
Lead case: 4:22-md-03047
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-02273 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Florida Middle, 3:24-cv-00208 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 5:05 PM PDT |
Defendant
YouTube LLC
|
|
Defendant
XXVI Holdings Inc
|
|
Defendant
TikTok Ltd
|
|
Defendant
TikTok LLC
251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808 |
|
Defendant
TikTok Inc.
TikTok Inc. 5800 Bristol Parkway Suite 100
Culver City, CA 90230 |
|
Defendant
Snap Inc.
3000 31st Street
Santa Monica, CA 90405 |
|
Defendant
Siculus Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Meta Platforms Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Instagram LLC
|
|
Defendant
Google LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Technologies, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Operations, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Holdings, LLC
Corporation Service Company 251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808 |
|
Defendant
Bytedance Ltd
|
|
Defendant
ByteDance Inc.
ByteDance Inc. 1920 Olympic Blvd
Santa Monica, CA 90404 |
|
Defendant
Alphabet Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Putnam County School District
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Meta Payments Inc
Terminated: 03/06/2024
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 1:42 PM
COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against Alphabet Inc., ByteDance Ltd., ByteDance, Inc., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Google LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Payments Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap Inc., TikTok Ltd., TikTok, Inc., TikTok, LLC, XXVI Holdings Inc., Youtube, LLC. Filed by Putnam County School District.(Bryant, Arthur) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Supplement | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 04/16 4:43 PM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 3:24-cv-00208. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Wed 04/17 12:12 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 3047: District of Florida Middle, 3:24-cv-00208, Putnam County School District v. Alphabet Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 4:24-cv-02273-YGR cc: JPMDL (krp, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 ORDER re 8 Plaintiff's Corrected Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Meta Payments Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the Clerk is directed to terminate Meta Payments Inc. as a Defendant in this matter and amend the case style accordingly. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/5/2024. (CKS) | |
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Putnam County School District (Pickert, Alan) | |
7 | 7 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal without prejudice as to Meta Platforms, Inc. Only by Putnam County School District (Pickert, Alan) Modified on 3/4/2024 to edit docket text (JDR). | |
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS) | |
5 | 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 2/27/2024. (CKS) | |
4 | 4 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (MCB) | |
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:24-cv-00208-WWB-PDB. (TRF) | |
2 | 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL John Wayne Hogan, Cyrus Mehri, Joshua Karsh, Benjamin Bailey, John Barrett, Leslie A. Brueckner and Arthur Bryant of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TRF) | |
1 | 1 100 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21803908) filed by Putnam County School District.(Pickert, Alan) Modified text on 2/27/2024 (MCB). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 15 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 16 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 17 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 18 Proposed Summons |