Del Rosario, MD et al v. McCrary
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cynthia Bashant |
Referred: | Valerie E Torres |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00686 |
Nature of Suit | 160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits |
Cause | 28:1332ij Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 5:05 PM PDT |
Defendant
Jack McCrary
|
|
Plaintiff
Bridge Prenatal, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gelen Del Rosario, MD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arij Faksh, DO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Declaration
Fri 04/26 11:13 AM
DECLARATION re3 Order to Show Cause Declaration of Bridge Prenatal LLC by Plaintiff Bridge Prenatal, LLC. (Ravin, William) (mjw) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/26 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bridge Prenatal, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Ravin, William) (mjw) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 04/24 5:27 PM
Order To Show Cause Re: Diversity Jurisdiction. Order to Show Cause Response due by 5/1/2024. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 04/24/2024.(mjw) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 3:57 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axi) |
|
1 | 1
4
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 3:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Jack McCrary ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18764516.), filed by Gelen Del Rosario, MD, Bridge Prenatal, LLC, Arij Faksh, DO. The new case number is 3:24-cv-686-BAS-VET. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres are assigned to the case. (Ravin, William)(axi) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |