Idaho District Court
Judge:Amanda K Brailsford
Case #: 4:24-cv-00199
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 13, 2024 3:06 AM MDT
Defendant
HukariAscendent, Inc.
Represented By
Jaclyn Terese Gans
Elam & Burke, P.A.
contact info
Matthew L Walters
Elam & Burke
contact info
Defendant
Idaho Environmental Coalition, LLC.
Represented By
Brad P Miller
Hawley Troxell Ennis & Hawley
contact info
Marvin Keith Smith
Hawley Troxell Ennis & Hawley, LLP
contact info
Tifani Minette Silveria
Hawley Troxell
contact info
Plaintiff
David Frisby
Represented By
Amanda Elizabeth Ulrich
Casperson Ulrich Dustin PLLC
contact info
Shawnee Perdue
Casperson Ulrich Dustin PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
19 19 order Protective Order Wed 11/06 11:18 AM
ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - The Court having before it the parties' Stipulated Protective Order (Dkt.18 ), and finding good cause therefore, the parties' Stipulated Protective Order is hereby adopted and approved. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
18 18 misc Stipulation Tue 11/05 11:54 AM
STIPULATION Protective Order by David Frisby. (Perdue, Shawnee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
utility Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents Tue 08/06 12:19 PM
The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (hs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Order Thu 08/01 1:33 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER- TRACK: (Standard) Dispositive Motion Deadline: due by 6/16/2025. Amendment of Pleadings and Joinder of Parties: due by 11/1/2024. Alternative Dispute Resolution: Mediation shall take place by 5/2/2025. Completion of Fact Discovery: due by 5/30/2025. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
16 16 misc Discovery Plan Tue 07/30 7:53 PM
DISCOVERY PLAN by David Frisby Stipulated . (Ulrich, Amanda)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form Tue 07/30 7:35 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by David Frisby. (Ulrich, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
14 14 order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 07/25 4:23 PM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER VACATING HEARING AND RESETTING DEADLINES. At the parties' request, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/2024 is VACATED and the parties shall now submit joint litigation and discovery plans to the Court on or before 7/30/2024. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 07/09 2:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Idaho Environmental Coalition, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Idaho Environmental Coalition, Other Affiliate Jacobs Technology, inc., Other Affiliate North Wind Portage, Inc. for Idaho Environmental Coalition, LLC.. (Miller, Brad)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
12 12 order Litigation Order Mon 07/08 11:30 AM
LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before July 25, 2024, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/2024 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Amanda K Brailsford. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Availability Setting Deadline Tue 07/02 8:48 AM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for HukariAscendent, Inc. re9 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/3/2024. (hs)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 07/02 8:50 AM
DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (hs)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/01 11:39 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by HukariAscendent, Inc.. (Gans, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/01 11:37 AM
Answer to Complaint ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Demand for Jury Trial by HukariAscendent, Inc..(Gans, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
8 8 misc Consent Filed Tue 06/04 12:41 PM
Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (hs)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Availability Setting Deadline Tue 06/04 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for David Frisby, Idaho Environmental Coalition, LLC. re6 Answer to Complaint,1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/5/2024. (hs)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/04 9:49 AM
DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (hs)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/31 3:19 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Demand for Jury Trial by Idaho Environmental Coalition, LLC..(Miller, Brad)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/31 1:05 PM
NOTICE by David Frisby of Status of Service and Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer-Defendant HukariAscendant, Inc. (Ulrich, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/30 4:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Frisby. HukariAscendent, Inc. served on 5/10/2024, answer due 5/31/2024; Idaho Environmental Coalition, LLC. served on 5/10/2024, answer due 5/31/2024.(Ulrich, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Service
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
3 3 misc Status Report Wed 05/15 5:06 PM
STATUS REPORT of Service by David Frisby. (Ulrich, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 04/17 9:16 AM
Summons Issued as to HukariAscendent, Inc., Idaho Environmental Coalition, LLC.. (Print attached Summons for service.)(hs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons - HukariAscendent
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/16 4:19 PM
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIDDC-2738433.), filed by David Frisby.(Ulrich, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons HukariAscendent, Inc.,
Att: 3 Summons Idaho Environmental Coalition, LLC.