Bronson v. Leduc
Vermont District Court | |
Judge: | Geoffrey W Crawford |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00418 |
Nature of Suit | 375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act |
Cause | 31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 1:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
MA, LADC Greg Leduc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MSj. Mcp, QMHP Howard F Bronson
112 Jockey Hollow Road
East Dover, VT 05341 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/18 10:15 AM
ORDER granting5 and6 MOTIONS for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark W. Peters and Devin J. Dunkley respectively. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 4/18/2024. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/17 4:58 PM
NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by Greg Leduc. (originally filed 4/17/2024 in state court) (sjl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 04/17 4:56 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Permission to File Addendum to Original March 19th10 Complaint. Signed by Superior Court Judge David Barra on 4/15/2024. (originally filed 4/15/2024 in state court) (sjl) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 04/17 4:53 PM
MOTION for Permission to File Second Addendum to Original March 19th10 Complaint filed by Howard F Bronson. (originally filed 4/5/2024 in state court) (sjl) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Mailing | ||
14 | 14
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 04/17 4:51 PM
MOTION for Permission to File Addendum to Original March 19th10 Complaint filed by Howard F Bronson. (originally filed 4/1/2024 in state court) (sjl) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 4:49 PM
ISSUED Summons as to Greg Leduc. (originally filed on 3/20/2024 in state court) (sjl) |
|
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/17 4:47 PM
ORDER granting11 Application to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs. Signed by State Court Clerk on 3/18/2024. (Originally filed on 3/20/2024 in state court) (sjl) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/17 4:43 PM
APPLICATION to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs filed by Howard F Bronson. (originally filed 3/19/2024 in state court) (sjl) |
|
10 | 10
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Greg Leduc filed by Howard F Bronson. (originally filed 3/19/2024 in state court) (sjl) |
|
9 | 9
misc
File Received from State Court
Wed 04/17 4:38 PM
RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (sjl) |
|
8 | 8
utility
Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)
Wed 04/17 3:24 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re:6 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Devin J. Dunkley filed by Greg Leduc. The exhibits were uploaded as a singular PDF and have been broken apart. The corrected documents are now attached to6 as well as this entry. (jh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
7 | 7
utility
Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)
Wed 04/17 3:23 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re:5 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Mark W. Peters filed by Greg Leduc. The exhibits were uploaded as a singular PDF and have been broken apart. The corrected documents are now attached to5 as well as this entry. (jh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/17 2:32 PM
MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Devin J. Dunkley (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number AVTDC-1909626) filed by Greg Leduc(Nolan, Jeffrey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/17/2024) (jh). (jh) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Devin J. Dunkley | ||
Att: 2 (4/17/2024) Exhibit 1 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/17 2:17 PM
MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Mark W. Peters (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number AVTDC-1909613) filed by Greg Leduc(Nolan, Jeffrey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/17/2024) (jh). (jh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 (4/17/2024) Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 (4/17/2024) Exhibit 2 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Wed 04/17 12:41 PM
LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Windham Unit, Civil Division, requesting original case file and certified docket sheet. (sjl) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)
Wed 04/17 12:26 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Greg Leduc. The Civil Cover Sheet has been replaced to remove editable fields and the instruction page. The corrected document is now attached to1 and this entry. (sjl) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 04/17 12:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Greg Leduc (Nolan, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/17/2024 to clarify attachment (sjl) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 04/17 10:17 AM
This case is assigned to Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (kac) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 04/16 6:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Greg Leduc from Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Windham Unit, case number 24-cv-01092. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AVTDC-1909416) (Nolan, Jeffrey) Filing date corrected on 4/17/2024 due to pay.gov unavailability. (jh). (Attachment 1 replaced and text/attachments clarified on 4/17/2024) (sjl) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C |