Patel v. Jaddou
Vermont District Court | |
Judge: | Geoffrey W Crawford |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00419 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 1:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
|
|
Plaintiff
Ritaben B. Patel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/22 9:03 AM
ORDER granting3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Omar A. Abuzir. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 4/22/2024. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/19 4:28 PM
MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Omar A. Abuzir (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number AVTDC-1911270) filed by Ritaben B. Patel(Green, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Omar A. Abuzir, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing - IL | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 04/17 11:58 AM
ISSUED Summonses as to Ur M. Jaddou, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (sjl) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 6:55 PM
COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus against Ur M. Jaddou filed by Ritaben B. Patel. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AVTDC-1909273)(Green, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Summons for Merrick Garland, | ||
Att: 5 Summons for U.S. Attorney, | ||
Att: 6 Summons for Ur M. Jaddou | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 04/17 9:23 AM
This case is assigned to Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (kac) |