Porter v. Aramark Fordham University Community Dinning
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Paul Oetken |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02889 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332nr Diversity: Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 1:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Aramark Campus, LLC
Morgan, Lewis and Bockius, LLP 101 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10178 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edgar M Porter
456 Dekalb Avenue Apt 12D
Brooklyn, NY 11205 |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
misc
Mailing Receipt
Tue 04/23 11:24 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Edgar M Porter 456 Dekalb Avenue Apt 12D Brooklyn, NY 11205. (vn) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Memo Endorsement
Mon 04/22 2:37 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:3 Letter filed by Aramark Fordham University Community Dinning. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this case and reimburse the filing fee to Defendant Aramark Campus LLC. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/22/2024) (ate) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter
Thu 04/18 1:45 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Ashley Hale dated 4/18/2024 re: Dismissal of case and reimbursement of filing fee. Document filed by Aramark Fordham University Community Dinning..(Hale, Ashley) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Wed 04/17 11:37 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ashley Jean Hale. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Aramark Campus, LLC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name entered incorrectly. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Wed 04/17 11:39 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ashley Jean Hale. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 ; the County code has been modified to Kings; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/17 11:40 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/17 11:41 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/17 11:41 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/16 7:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hale, Ashley) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/16 7:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of Kings. Case Number: 276/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29228088).Document filed by Aramark Campus, LLC..(Hale, Ashley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |