SHIFERAW v. AHMAD et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02890 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332tm Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 1:12 AM EDT |
All Defendants
SOHAIL AHMAD
|
|
All Defendants
ARSLAN RIAZ
|
|
All Plaintiffs
TADESSE SHIFERAW
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Mon 04/22 2:56 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jason A. Linden to RE-FILE re: Document No. 5 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the order granting permission to file the pleading was not attached; Court's leave has not been granted. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (vf) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 5:29 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by Tadesse Shiferaw..(Linden, Jason) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/19 5:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Linden, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Removal of Party
Wed 04/17 10:53 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Jason A. Linden. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: SOHAIL AHMAD. The party was added to the case in error. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Wed 04/17 10:54 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jason A. Linden to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; the pleading was not signed. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Wed 04/17 10:56 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jason A. Linden. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: TADESSE SHIFERAW, ARSLAN RIAZ. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/17 10:59 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jason A. Linden to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Origin and Basis of Jurisdiction section of Form not provided; the form is not properly signed.. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Wed 04/17 11:00 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jason A. Linden. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/17 11:03 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/17 11:04 AM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/17 11:04 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/17 11:23 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jason A. Linden to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Defendant party name listed on Summons PDF; Summons Caption and ECF docket entry does not correspond to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/16 8:32 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sohail Ahmad and Arslan Riaz, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by TADESSE SHIFERAW..(Linden, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/16 8:27 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Linden, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 8:03 PM
COMPLAINT against TADESSE SHIFERAW. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29228156)Document filed by TADESSE SHIFERAW..(Linden, Jason) |